Chiamulera v. TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Chiamulera
Defendant: TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv09512
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. TLA Entertainment Group, Inc. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service was accepted by Sou Zouky, Authorized Service Agent. Document filed by Dennis Chiamulera. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.. (pc)
October 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 18:2710;. (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dennis Chiamulera. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TLA Entertainment Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Chiamulera. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17774397)Document filed by Dennis Chiamulera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiamulera v. TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLA Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Chiamulera
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?