O'Kane v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Randy O'Kane
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv09662
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter filed by Randy O'Kane. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 2/5/20, at 2:00. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/10/2019) (jca)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Rosemary M. Rivas dated 12/09/2019 re: Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Randy O'Kane.(Rivas, Rosemary)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Sylvan Landau on behalf of Randy O'Kane. (Landau, Kevin)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Conference , request for pre-motion conference to discuss Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Seth E. Spitzer dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Spitzer, Seth)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rosemary M. Rivas on behalf of Randy O'Kane. New Address: Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, 388 Market Street, Suite 1300, San Francisco, California, USA 94111, 415-373-1671. (Rivas, Rosemary)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 MOTION for Lazaro Fernandez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 MOTION for Megan L. Whipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 MOTION for Gayle I. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Lazaro Fernandez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18096086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Lazaro Fernandez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18096086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lazaro Fernandez, Jr., with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Lazaro)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Megan L. Whipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Megan L. Whipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan L. Whipp, with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whipp, Megan)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Gayle I. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Gayle I. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gayle I. Jenkins, with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Gayle)
November 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: JetBlue Airways Corporation answer due 12/18/2019. (jca)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint (ECF No. 1). The time to answer is extended to 12/18/19. Any motions must be handled as per the Court's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/12/2019) (jca)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Rosemary M. Rivas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/12/19) (yv)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint (ECF No. 1), addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Seth E. Spitzer dated November 8, 2019. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Spitzer, Seth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Eliot Spitzer on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Spitzer, Seth)
November 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Rosemary M. Rivas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17954069. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Rosemary M. Rivas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17954069. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Randy O'Kane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa R. Emert. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Dollar Demand left blank; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1391; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to Rockland. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melissa R. Emert. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Randy O'Kane, JetBlue Airways Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JetBlue Airways Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Randy O'Kane. (Emert, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emert, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17799126)Document filed by Randy O'Kane.(Emert, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Kane v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy O'Kane
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Kevin Sylvan Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Lazaro Fernandez, Jr
Represented By: Megan Whipp
Represented By: Gayle I Jenkins
Represented By: Seth Eliot Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?