Alexis et al v. Combe Incorporated
Plaintiff: Dewayne Tharpe, Samuel Young, James Minor, Hector De La Torre, James Traylor, Joe Trask, Robert Jones, Curtis Turner, Edward Keohou, Chester Bromby, Leonard Wolff, William Jones, James Pettaway, Mark Davis, Mark Fowler, Curtis Nelloms, David Williams, Richard Dorr, Samuel Baker, Maurice Releford, William Heron, Simmie Antione Browm, Maurice Childs, Jerome Jackson, Joe Taylor, Mark Harper, Billy Curry, Dennie Rivera, Kevin Lewis, Kenneth Lubic, Marc Martin, Michael Landie, Elzy Spruill, Samuel Uvegas, Charles Litteral, Kevin Johnston, Chris McClendon, Myron Pipes, Tiney Ward, Jon Deery, Bryan Carter, Dwight Crosby, Eric Samuels, Reyes Apodaca, Richard Castiano, Micahel Toliver, Joseph Kerber, Kyle Schirmer, Anthony Vellios, Larry Dustin, David Berrios, Douglas Diggs, Pierre Bibbs, James Potter, Justin Parker, Ardell Daniel, Michael Holden, Daniel Murphy, David Haley, Haywood Crawford, Eugene Miller, Tyrus Simmons, Cruz Cisneros, George Villamil, Preston Mosley, Harry Thompson, Shawn Matthews, Roy Stewart, Edward Parker, Wilmer Arnold, Robert Tucker, Marcus Powell, Jeffrey Joyner, William McDonald, Julio Concepcion, John Moore, Leonard Horne, Anthony White, Dennis Delaney, Kenneth Bernard, John Foster, Michael McIntosh, Jeff Kalb, Ivan Russell, Anthony Pharr, Everardo Parma Gonzalez, Angelo Dourlas, Frank Davis, Bryant Street, Albert Rocky, Samuel Gray, Joseph Gluz, Mark Brooks, Rodney Thomas, Robert Lee, Stephen Gilstrap, Detective Christopher Hayes, Randy Thomas, Marc Hollis, Henry Alexis, Richard Turner, Ronald Martinez, Raymond Stout, Davian Ross, Terrence Frye, Benjamin Davis, Darrell Davis, Ruben Bustillos, Mark Perea, Wayne Matthews, Leon Graham, Daniel Harrison, Sam Shames, Stephen Nichols, Jason Johnson, Dennis Douville, Zang Angelfire, Creed Culp, Tommy McBride, Sean Dempsey, Marcus Matthews, William Wagoner, Rick Pippin, Hector Valentin, Andrew Henderson, DAVID GAMBLE, Ronald Smith, Richard Morris, Stephen Bateman, Anton Gadsden, Kevin Swan, Thomas McGinnis, Michael Harris, James Rapp, Chris McLendon, Marc Davis and Michael Toliver
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2019cv10358
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Jones Howell on behalf of Combe Incorporated. (Howell, Kelly)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Combe Incorporated waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by Anthony Vellios; Richard Dorr; Justin Parker; Harry Thompson; Marc Martin; Davian Ross; Haywood Crawford; Samuel Uvegas; Cruz Cisneros; Leon Graham; Leonard Horne; Richard Morris; Hector De La Torre; Rick Pippin; Michael Holden; Creed Culp; Elzy Spruill; Edward Parker; Douglas Diggs; Larry Dustin; Simmie Antione Browm; William McDonald; Anthony Pharr; Sam Shames; Joseph Kerber; Dennis Delaney; Joe Taylor; Jason Johnson; Maurice Childs; Eugene Miller; Robert Jones; Albert Rocky; Marcus Matthews; Daniel Murphy; Tommy McBride; Jeffrey Joyner; Robert Lee; William Wagoner; Zang Angelfire; Julio Concepcion; Roy Stewart; James Minor; Richard Castiano; Bryant Street; Charles Litteral; Daniel Harrison; Darrell Davis; Richard Turner; Eric Samuels; Anthony White; James Traylor; Thomas McGinnis; Benjamin Davis; James Potter; Hector Valentin; Mark Harper; Pierre Bibbs; James Rapp; Mark Fowler; Rodney Thomas; Everardo Parma Gonzalez; Stephen Bateman; Angelo Dourlas; Billy Curry; Jeff Kalb; David Berrios; Marc Davis; Michael McIntosh; Michael Toliver; Maurice Releford; Ronald Martinez; Shawn Matthews; William Jones; Ronald Smith; Dewayne Tharpe; James Pettaway; Ivan Russell; Mark Brooks; Kevin Swan; Mark Perea; Michael Harris; Tyrus Simmons; Curtis Nelloms; Chris McLendon; Leonard Wolff; Curtis Turner; Christopher Hayes; Anton Gadsden; Edward Keohou; Marcus Powell; Ruben Bustillos; Stephen Gilstrap; William Heron; Jerome Jackson; Samuel Gray; Michael Landie; Dwight Crosby; Marc Hollis; Kenneth Lubic; Kevin Lewis; Henry Alexis; Wilmer Arnold; Stephen Nichols; Randy Thomas; Sean Dempsey; Dennie Rivera; George Villamil; Frank Davis; Jon Deery; Joe Trask; Samuel Young; David Gamble; Wayne Matthews; John Moore; Kevin Johnston; Tiney Ward; Robert Tucker; Joseph Gluz; Ardell Daniel; David Haley; Bryan Carter; Kyle Schirmer; Kenneth Bernard; Preston Mosley; John Foster; Reyes Apodaca; Myron Pipes; Andrew Henderson; Chester Bromby; Raymond Stout; Terrence Frye; Samuel Baker; Dennis Douville; David Williams. (Abaray, Janet)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Janet G. Abaray to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
December 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Janet G. Abaray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18190383. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Janet G. Abaray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18190383. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry Alexis, Zang Angelfire, Reyes Apodaca, Wilmer Arnold, Samuel Baker, Stephen Bateman, Kenneth Bernard, David Berrios, Pierre Bibbs, Chester Bromby, Mark Brooks, Simmie Antione Browm, Ruben Bustillos, Bryan Carter, Richard Castiano, Maurice Childs, Cruz Cisneros, Julio Concepcion, Haywood Crawford, Dwight Crosby, Creed Culp, Billy Curry, Ardell Daniel, Benjamin Davis, Darrell Davis, Frank Davis, Marc Davis, Hector De La Torre, Jon Deery, Dennis Delaney, Sean Dempsey, Douglas Diggs, Richard Dorr, Angelo Dourlas, Dennis Douville, Larry Dustin, John Foster, Mark Fowler, Terrence Frye, Anton Gadsden, David Gamble, Stephen Gilstrap, Joseph Gluz, Everardo Parma Gonzalez, Leon Graham, Samuel Gray, David Haley, Mark Harper, Michael Harris, Daniel Harrison, Christopher Hayes, Andrew Henderson, William Heron, Michael Holden, Marc Hollis, Leonard Horne, Jerome Jackson, Jason Johnson, Kevin Johnston, Robert Jones, William Jones, Jeffrey Joyner, Jeff Kalb, Edward Keohou, Joseph Kerber, Michael Landie, Robert Lee, Kevin Lewis, Charles Litteral, Kenneth Lubic, Marc Martin, Ronald Martinez, Marcus Matthews, Shawn Matthews, Wayne Matthews, Tommy McBride, William McDonald, Thomas McGinnis, Michael McIntosh, Chris McLendon, Eugene Miller, James Minor, John Moore, Richard Morris, Preston Mosley, Daniel Murphy, Curtis Nelloms, Stephen Nichols, Edward Parker, Justin Parker, Mark Perea, James Pettaway, Anthony Pharr, Myron Pipes, Rick Pippin, James Potter, Marcus Powell, James Rapp, Maurice Releford, Dennie Rivera, Albert Rocky, Davian Ross, Ivan Russell, Eric Samuels, Kyle Schirmer, Sam Shames, Tyrus Simmons, Ronald Smith, Elzy Spruill, Roy Stewart, Raymond Stout, Bryant Street, Kevin Swan, Joe Taylor, Dewayne Tharpe, Randy Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Harry Thompson, Michael Toliver, Joe Trask, James Traylor, Robert Tucker, Curtis Turner, Richard Turner, Samuel Uvegas, Hector Valentin, Anthony Vellios, George Villamil, William Wagoner, Tiney Ward, Anthony White, David Williams, Leonard Wolff, Samuel Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Order Approving Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Abaray, Janet)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judi Curry on behalf of Combe Incorporated. (Curry, Judi)
November 13, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-06187-CS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Shane C. Fulton dated November 12, 2019 re: Transfer of Related Case to Judge Seibel. Document filed by Henry Alexis, Zang Angelfire, Reyes Apodaca, Wilmer Arnold, Samuel Baker, Stephen Bateman, Kenneth Bernard, David Berrios, Pierre Bibbs, Chester Bromby, Mark Brooks, Simmie Antione Browm, Ruben Bustillos, Bryan Carter, Richard Castiano, Maurice Childs, Cruz Cisneros, Julio Concepcion, Haywood Crawford, Dwight Crosby, Creed Culp, Billy Curry, Ardell Daniel, Benjamin Davis, Darrell Davis, Frank Davis, Marc Davis, Hector De La Torre, Jon Deery, Dennis Delaney, Sean Dempsey, Douglas Diggs, Richard Dorr, Angelo Dourlas, Dennis Douville, Larry Dustin, John Foster, Mark Fowler, Terrence Frye, Anton Gadsden, David Gamble, Stephen Gilstrap, Joseph Gluz, Everardo Parma Gonzalez, Leon Graham, Samuel Gray, David Haley, Mark Harper, Michael Harris, Daniel Harrison, Christopher Hayes, Andrew Henderson, William Heron, Michael Holden, Marc Hollis, Leonard Horne, Jerome Jackson, Jason Johnson, Kevin Johnston, Robert Jones, William Jones, Jeffrey Joyner, Jeff Kalb, Edward Keohou, Joseph Kerber, Michael Landie, Robert Lee, Kevin Lewis, Charles Litteral, Kenneth Lubic, Marc Martin, Ronald Martinez, Marcus Matthews, Shawn Matthews, Wayne Matthews, Tommy McBride, William McDonald, Thomas McGinnis, Michael McIntosh, Chris McLendon, Eugene Miller, James Minor, John Moore, Richard Morris, Preston Mosley, Daniel Murphy, Curtis Nelloms, Stephen Nichols, Edward Parker, Justin Parker, Mark Perea, James Pettaway, Anthony Pharr, Myron Pipes, Rick Pippin, James Potter, Marcus Powell, James Rapp, Maurice Releford, Dennie Rivera, Albert Rocky, Davian Ross, Ivan Russell, Eric Samuels, Kyle Schirmer, Sam Shames, Tyrus Simmons, Ronald Smith, Elzy Spruill, Roy Stewart, Raymond Stout, Bryant Street, Kevin Swan, Joe Taylor, Dewayne Tharpe, Randy Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Harry Thompson, Michael Toliver, Joe Trask, James Traylor, Robert Tucker, Curtis Turner, Richard Turner, Samuel Uvegas, Hector Valentin, Anthony Vellios, George Villamil, William Wagoner, Tiney Ward, Anthony White, David Williams, Leonard Wolff, Samuel Young.(Fulton, Shane)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulton, Shane)
November 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shane Christopher Fulton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marc Davis; David Gamble; Chris McLendon; Michael Toliver. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shane Christopher Fulton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged);. (jgo)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulton, Shane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Combe Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17917859)Document filed by Anthony Vellios, Richard Dorr, Justin Parker, Harry Thompson, Marc Martin, Davian Ross, Haywood Crawford, Samuel Uvegas, Cruz Cisneros, Leon Graham, Leonard Horne, Richard Morris, Hector De La Torre, Rick Pippin, Michael Holden, Creed Culp, Elzy Spruill, Edward Parker, Douglas Diggs, Larry Dustin, Simmie Antione Browm, William McDonald, Anthony Pharr, Sam Shames, Joseph Kerber, Dennis Delaney, Joe Taylor, Jason Johnson, Maurice Childs, Eugene Miller, Robert Jones, Albert Rocky, Marcus Matthews, Daniel Murphy, Tommy McBride, Jeffrey Joyner, Robert Lee, William Wagoner, Zang Angelfire, Julio Concepcion, Roy Stewart, James Minor, Richard Castiano, Bryant Street, Charles Litteral, Daniel Harrison, Darrell Davis, Richard Turner, Eric Samuels, Anthony White, James Traylor, Thomas McGinnis, Benjamin Davis, James Potter, Hector Valentin, Mark Harper, Pierre Bibbs, James Rapp, Mark Fowler, Rodney Thomas, Everardo Parma Gonzalez, Stephen Bateman, Angelo Dourlas, Billy Curry, Jeff Kalb, David Berrios, Mark Davis, Michael McIntosh, Micahel Toliver, Maurice Releford, Ronald Martinez, Shawn Matthews, William Jones, Ronald Smith, Dewayne Tharpe, James Pettaway, Ivan Russell, Mark Brooks, Kevin Swan, Mark Perea, Michael Harris, Tyrus Simmons, Curtis Nelloms, Chris McClendon, Leonard Wolff, Curtis Turner, Christopher Hayes, Anton Gadsden, Edward Keohou, Marcus Powell, Ruben Bustillos, Stephen Gilstrap, William Heron, Jerome Jackson, Samuel Gray, Michael Landie, Dwight Crosby, Marc Hollis, Kenneth Lubic, Kevin Lewis, Henry Alexis, Wilmer Arnold, Stephen Nichols, Randy Thomas, Sean Dempsey, Dennie Rivera, George Villamil, Frank Davis, Jon Deery, Joe Trask, Samuel Young, DAVID GAMBLE, Wayne Matthews, John Moore, Kevin Johnston, Tiney Ward, Robert Tucker, Joseph Gluz, Ardell Daniel, David Haley, Bryan Carter, Kyle Schirmer, Kenneth Bernard, Preston Mosley, John Foster, Reyes Apodaca, Myron Pipes, Andrew Henderson, Chester Bromby, Raymond Stout, Terrence Frye, Samuel Baker, Dennis Douville, David Williams.(Fulton, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis et al v. Combe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Tharpe
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Young
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Minor
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector De La Torre
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Traylor
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Trask
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Turner
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Keohou
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Bromby
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Wolff
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pettaway
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Nelloms
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dorr
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Baker
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Releford
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Heron
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmie Antione Browm
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Childs
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Jackson
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Taylor
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Harper
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Curry
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennie Rivera
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lewis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lubic
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Martin
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Landie
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elzy Spruill
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Uvegas
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Litteral
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Johnston
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McClendon
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Pipes
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiney Ward
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Deery
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Carter
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Crosby
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Samuels
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Apodaca
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Castiano
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micahel Toliver
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kerber
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Schirmer
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vellios
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dustin
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Berrios
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Diggs
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Bibbs
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Potter
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Parker
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardell Daniel
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holden
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Murphy
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Haley
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haywood Crawford
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Miller
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrus Simmons
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz Cisneros
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Villamil
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Mosley
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Thompson
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Matthews
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Stewart
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Parker
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Arnold
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tucker
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Powell
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Joyner
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McDonald
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Concepcion
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moore
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Horne
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony White
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Delaney
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bernard
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Foster
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McIntosh
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Kalb
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Russell
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pharr
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo Parma Gonzalez
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Dourlas
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Davis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Street
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Rocky
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Gray
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gluz
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brooks
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Thomas
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gilstrap
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detective Christopher Hayes
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Thomas
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Hollis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Alexis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Turner
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Martinez
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Stout
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davian Ross
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Frye
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Davis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Bustillos
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Perea
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Matthews
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Graham
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Harrison
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Shames
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Nichols
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Johnson
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Douville
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zang Angelfire
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creed Culp
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy McBride
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Dempsey
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Matthews
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wagoner
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Pippin
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Valentin
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Henderson
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID GAMBLE
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Morris
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bateman
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Gadsden
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Swan
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McGinnis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rapp
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McLendon
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Davis
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Toliver
Represented By: Shane Christopher Fulton
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Represented By: Kelly Jones Howell
Represented By: Judi Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?