State Farm Automobile Insurance Company v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States Of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv10708
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Of America served on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Markowitz, Stuart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Of America served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. Service was accepted by J. Mayers. Document filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Markowitz, Stuart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Kahane on behalf of United States Of America. (Kahane, Joshua)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America. (pc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Markowitz, Stuart)
November 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stuart D. Markowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Requests may only be linked to one pleading; link the summons request to the pleading accepted by the court. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stuart D. Markowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Wrong Event Type; a pleading has already been accepted by the court. If you wish to make changes to the initial pleading, you must file an Amended Complaint. The All Defendant radio button was selected; the docket entry must reflect all of the parties as to whom the pleading is being filed against. Select multiple parties by holding the 'Ctrl' button. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint, #3 Complaint. Document filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Markowitz, Stuart) Modified on 11/21/2019 (dnh).
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company.(Markowitz, Stuart) Modified on 11/21/2019 (dnh).
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Markowitz, Stuart)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stuart D. Markowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; plaintiff name must appear exactly as it does on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Stuart D. Markowitz to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; caption error; plaintiff name on civil cover sheet must appear exactly as it does on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stuart D. Markowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company; United States Of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
November 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18096267)Document filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Markowitz, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart D. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart D. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?