Martinez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Freddy Martinez
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv11320
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. United States of America served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Freddy Martinez. (Dratch, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dratch, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Freddy Martinez. (Dratch, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brian Michael Dratch. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Michael Dratch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:2672; Dollar Demand none;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2000000;. (jgo)
December 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Michael Dratch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18259161)Document filed by Freddy Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dratch, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Martinez
Represented By: Brian Michael Dratch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?