Bongers v. M&T Bank Corporation
Plaintiff: Doreen Bongers
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv11440
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. M&T Bank Corporation served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020; Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. Service was accepted by Robert J. Fluskey, Jr. Esq., of Hodgson Russ, LLP, attorneys for Defendants. Document filed by Doreen Bongers..(Sheridan, Marc)
January 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Owen Sheridan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against M&T Bank Corporation, MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY d/b/a M & T BANK with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Doreen Bongers. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheridan, Marc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management and Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by M&T Bank Corporation.(Fluskey, Robert)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by M&T Bank Corporation.(Fluskey, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: M&T Bank Corporation answer due 1/24/2020. (mml)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by M&T Bank Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 1/24/2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/14/2020) (mml)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Robert Fluskey dated 1/14/2020 re: Request for Extension of Time on Consent. Document filed by M&T Bank Corporation.(Fluskey, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. M&T Bank Corporation served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by Doreen Bongers. (Sheridan, Marc)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Owen Sheridan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Ulster. (pne)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M&T Bank Corporation. (pne)
December 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M & T Bank Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Bongers. (Sheridan, Marc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheridan, Marc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M&T Bank Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18277781)Document filed by Doreen Bongers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheridan, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bongers v. M&T Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Bongers
Represented By: Marc Owen Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Fluskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?