Freeman et al v. Rafat et al
Plaintiff: Edward Freeman and Deborah Posey Freeman
Defendant: Payam Rafat, Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital, Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center and Montefiore Mt. Vernon Hospital
Case Number: 7:2020cv00127
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, by their respective counsel, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' claims only against the Sole Federal Defendant, Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, in this action are dismissed with prejudice, 2. This action is hereby remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester, as there is no longer federal subject matter jurisdiction due to the discontinuance of the action against the Sole Federal Defendant, MT. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center. SO ORDERED. Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center terminated. (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 31, 2020 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1000 794 9 on 2/3/2020. (mml)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center. (Cowart, Brandon)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management and Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milan Paul Spisek on behalf of Montefiore Mt. Vernon Hospital, Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital, Payam Rafat. (Spisek, Milan)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Michael La Sorsa on behalf of Deborah Posey Freeman, Edward Freeman. (La Sorsa, Gregory)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Dkt. Nos. 3 and 4 served on DEBORAH POSEY FREEMAN. EDWARD FREEMAN PAYAM RAFAT DPM, MONTEFIORE, MT. VERNON HOSPITAL, MONTEFIORE NEW ROCHELLE HOSPITAL on January 23, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center. (Cowart, Brandon)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 2/14/2020. By 1/24/2020, defense counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiffs' counsel and file proof of service of same. By 1/29/2020, plaintiffs'counsel shall file a notice of appearance in this action. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (vjm)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (wb)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brandon Cowart dated January 9, 2020. Document filed by Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center.(Cowart, Brandon)
January 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68436/2018..Document filed by Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Certification))(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. Rafat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payam Rafat
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Vernon Neighborhood Health Center
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Mt. Vernon Hospital
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Freeman
Represented By: Gregory Michael La Sorsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Posey Freeman
Represented By: Gregory Michael La Sorsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?