Wallace v. Nuvance Health et al
Plaintiff: Leah Wallace
Defendant: Health Quest Systems, Inc. and Nuvance Health
Consolidated Plaintiff: Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Chung Suk Crispell, Steven Super and Alexys Williamson
Case Number: 7:2020cv00545
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Melanie Lakin in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
August 14, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE granting #36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Having given due consideration to the relevant factors pursuant to Rule 23(g) (1), the Court hereby GRANTS the motion of Plaintiffs Leah Wallace, Stephen Gyscek, Stephen Super, Alexys Williamson, Nicole Digilio, and Chung Suk Crispell, for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and the Executive Committee, and therefore it is hereby ORDERED that the following are appointed and shall serve as Plaintiffs' Interim CoLead Class Counsel, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3): 1. Jason Sultzer, Esq, 2. Nicholas A Migliaccio, Esq. and Jason S. Rathod, Esq. As further set forth herein. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel will be responsible for and have plenary authority to prosecute any and all claims of the Plaintiffs and putative class and to provide general supervision of the activities of Plaintiffs' Counsel in the Consolidated Action. Specifically, Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, in consultation with the Executive Committee, shall have the following responsibilities, duties and sole authority as further set forth herein. and it is further ORDERED that counsel for all parties are directed to cooperate with one another, wherever possible, to promote the expeditious handling of pre-trial proceedings in the Consolidated Action, and to conduct themselves in a manner consistent with the Civility Principles of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. ORDERED that this Order shall apply to any action filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court which relates to the subject matter at issue in this case The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion (Doc. #36). As further set forth herein. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/27/2020) (ks)
July 24, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson..(Sultzer, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/22/2020 (kv)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER with respect to #36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Accordingly, the Court sua sponte extends the parties' time to oppose the motion to July 22, 2020. If no opposition is received by July 22, 2020, the Court will deem the motion fully submitted and unopposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/15/2020) (kv)
July 7, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Marie Pileika on behalf of Stephen Gyscek..(Pileika, Ashley)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Plaintiffs' time to oppose the motion to dismiss is extended to 7/24/2020. Defendant's reply to the motion to dismiss, if any, is due 8/14/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs)
July 7, 2020 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Nicholas A. Migliaccio dated July 7, 2020. Document filed by Stephen Gyscek..(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Melanie Lakin in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notification of Unauthorized Access to Health Quest Employees' Email Accounts, #2 Exhibit B- Notification of Unauthorized Access to Email Accounts Sent to Plaintiffs).(Collignon, Casie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
June 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #41 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 24, 2020 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson. Related Document Number: #36 ..(Sultzer, Jason) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 24, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION of James R. Peluso in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee.. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Sultzer, Jason)
June 24, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Jason S. Rathod in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee.. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Sultzer, Jason)
June 24, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Jason P. Sultzer in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee.. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Sultzer, Jason)
June 24, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee. . Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson..(Sultzer, Jason)
June 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Steven Super, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson..(Sultzer, Jason)
June 19, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Bradford Francis on behalf of Leah Wallace..(Francis, Jeremy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Health Quest Systems, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexys Williamson, Stephen Gyscek, Leah Wallace, Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Steven Super. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Sultzer, Jason)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Jason Samuel Rathod to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/18/2020) (mml)
May 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Jason Samuel Rathod to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19848954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 15, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Jason Samuel Rathod to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19848954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chung Suk Crispell, Nicole Digilio, Stephen Gyscek, Leah Wallace, Alexys Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jason S. Rathod, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rathod, Jason)
May 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2020. (mml)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases 7:20-CV-00545-(VB) (as Lead Case) with 7:20-CV-02719-(VB), 7:20-CV-01793-(VB), terminating #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, the Wallace, Gyscek and Williamson Actions are consolidated for all purposes. The lead case shall be the Wallace Action. The Gyscek and Williamson Actions will be administratively closed. 2. Plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Amended Complaint, which shall include the Plaintiffs from the Wallace, Gyscek and Williamson Actions, and which shall not include Nuvance Health as a defendant, on or before May 27, 2020, or within 10 days after the entry of the Courts Order granting this Stipulation, whichever comes later. 3. Health Quest Systems, Inc. shall file an answer or response to the Consolidated Amended Complaint on June 26, 2020, or 30 days after Plaintiffs file their Consolidated Amended Complaint, whichever comes later. 4. In the interest of efficient case management, the Court will terminate the pending motion in the Wallace action, 20 CV 545. (Doc. #17). The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion (Doc. #17) and terminate Nuvance Health form the docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/13/2020) (mml) Modified on 5/14/2020 (mml).
May 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #30 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
May 12, 2020 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Leah Wallace. Related Document Number: #29 ..(Sultzer, Jason) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 12, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 7:20-cv-02719 and 7:20-cv-01793 And File a Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Leah Wallace..(Sultzer, Jason)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: The motion to withdraw Michael Liskow as counsel for plaintiffs is granted. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Michael Liskow as plaintiffs' counsel. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: The motion to withdraw Janine L. Pollack as counsel for plaintiffs is granted. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Janine L. Pollack as plaintiffs' counsel. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Michael Liskow to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Leah Wallace..(Liskow, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Janine L. Pollack to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Leah Wallace..(Pollack, Janine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Sean B. Solis dated April 9, 2020 re: Related Case. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Solis, Sean)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is extended to 5/13/2020. By 6/3/2020, defendants may either (i) file an answer to the amended complaint, (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, or (iii) notify the Court by letter that they are relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs)
April 9, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Michael Liskow dated April 9, 2020. Document filed by Leah Wallace..(Liskow, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by Leah Wallace. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is 4/13/2020. By 5/4/2020, defendants may either (i) file an answer to the amended complaint, (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, or (iii) notify the Court by letter that they are relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2020. Motions due by 5/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/30/2020) (mml)
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Janine L. Pollack dated March 30, 2020 re: Plaintiff's Intent to Amend Complaint. Document filed by Leah Wallace..(Pollack, Janine)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: On March 19, 2020, defendants filed a motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). (Doc. #17). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than March 30, 2020, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter whether (i) she intends to file an amended complaint in response to the motion to dismiss, or (ii) she will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the motion will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiff a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendants motion. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC, 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"); accord F5 Capital v. Pappas, 856 F.3d 61, 89-90 (2d Cir. 2017). The time to file opposing and reply papers shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, plaintiff must file the amended complaint by no later than 14 days after notifying the Court of her intent to do so. Within 21 days of such amendment, defendants may either (i) file an answer to the amended complaint, (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, or (iii) notify the Court by letter that they are relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/20/2020) (rj)
March 19, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Collignon, Casie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Collignon, Casie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John Jacobs on behalf of Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Jacobs, Edward)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants: Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/19/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Casie Collignon dated 02/07/2020. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Collignon, Casie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Benjamin Solis on behalf of Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Solis, Sean)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Collignon, Casie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casie D Collignon on behalf of Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health..(Collignon, Casie)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Sean B. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #8). (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/5/2020) (mml)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules regarding discipline of attorneys. Counsel shall immediately forward the Pro Hac Vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #7). (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/5/2020) (mml)
February 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Sean B. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18688201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Sean B. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18688201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Solis, Sean)
February 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18687844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18687844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Collignon, Casie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Milton Liskow on behalf of Leah Wallace. (Liskow, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janine Lee Pollack on behalf of Leah Wallace. (Pollack, Janine)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health. (pc)
January 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NUVANCE HEALTH and HEALTH QUEST SYSTEMS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leah Wallace. (Sultzer, Jason)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sultzer, Jason)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Health Quest Systems, Inc., Nuvance Health. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18558841)Document filed by Leah Wallace.(Sultzer, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Nuvance Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Wallace
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Jeremy Bradford Francis
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Quest Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Benjamin Solis
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvance Health
Represented By: Sean Benjamin Solis
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nicole Digilio
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: James Rocco Peluso, Jr.
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stephen Gyscek
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Ashley Marie Pileika
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chung Suk Crispell
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: James Rocco Peluso, Jr.
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Super
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alexys Williamson
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Joseph Edward O'Connor
Represented By: James Rocco Peluso, Jr.
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?