G-Max Management, Inc. et al v. State Of New York et al
Plaintiff: 1139 Longfellow, LLC, Jane Ordway, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Siljay Holding LLC and G-Max Management, Inc.
Defendant: County Of Westchester, City Of New York, State Of New York, Letitia James, Ruthanne Visnauskas and Woody Pascal
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: City of Yonkers
Case Number: 7:2020cv00634
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 44 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Randy M. Mastro dated March 19, 2020 re: #42 LETTER MOTION for Conference and to Intervene addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Sean Baldwin dated March 12, 2020. . Document filed by 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC..(Mastro, Randy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Randy M. Mastro dated March 13, 2020 re: #36 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Plaintiffs' Counsel addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shi-Shi Wang dated March 6, 2020., #34 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Rachel K. Moston dated March 6, 2020. . Document filed by 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC..(Mastro, Randy)
March 12, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Conference and to Intervene addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Sean Baldwin dated March 12, 2020. Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)..(Baldwin, Sean)
March 12, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Baldwin on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)..(Baldwin, Sean)
March 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Duke on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)..(Duke, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thaddeus C. Eagles on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)..(Eagles, Thaddeus)
March 12, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N), Community Voices Heard (CVH)..(Halligan, Caitlin)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RULE 41(a)(l) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE CITY OF YONKERS: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiffs G-Max Management, Inc., 1139 Longfellow, LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, Siljay Holding LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Jane Ordway, Dexter Guerrieri, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, and 447-9 16th LLC (collectively, "Plaintiffs"), by their undersigned attorneys, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed as against Defendant City of Yonkers, without prejudice. This notice does not dismiss claims against any other Defendant in this action. SO ORDERED. City of Yonkers terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/7/2020) (jca)
March 6, 2020 Filing 36 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Plaintiffs' Counsel addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shi-Shi Wang dated March 6, 2020. Document filed by Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas. Return Date set for 3/13/2020 at 05:00 PM..(Wang, Shi-Shi)
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shi-Shi Wang on behalf of Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Wang, Shi-Shi)
March 6, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Rachel K. Moston dated March 6, 2020. Document filed by City Of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
March 6, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Brodsky on behalf of City Of New York..(Brodsky, Claudia)
March 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Kenneth M. Karas for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
March 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) City of Yonkers. Document filed by Dexter Guerrieri, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 1139 Longfellow, LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., 447-9 16th LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, Siljay Holding LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Jane Ordway, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Mastro, Randy)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 41(a)(1) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiffs G-Max Management, Inc., 1139 Longfellow, LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, Siljay Holding LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Jane Ordway, Dexter Guerrieri, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, and 447-9 16th LLC (collectively, "Plaintiffs"), by their undersigned attorneys, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed as against Defendant County of Westchester, without prejudice. This notice does not dismiss claims against any other Defendant in this action. SO ORDERED. County Of Westchester terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/24/2020) (jca)
February 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard L. Brodsky on behalf of City of Yonkers..(Brodsky, Richard)
February 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Kenneth M. Karas for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
February 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) County Of Westchester. Document filed by Dexter Guerrieri, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 1139 Longfellow, LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., 447-9 16th LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, Siljay Holding LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Jane Ordway, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Mastro, Randy)
February 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Timothy Carey on behalf of County Of Westchester..(Carey, Sean)
February 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Yonkers answer due 3/6/2020. (jca)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/18/2020) (jca)
February 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Kane Moston on behalf of City Of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
February 18, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew I Gallagher dated February 18, 2020. Document filed by City of Yonkers..(Gallagher, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: City Of New York answer due 3/6/2020. (jca)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint. Granted. Defendant may have until March 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/14/2020) (jca)
February 14, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #24 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jca)
February 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Letitia James answer due 3/6/2020; Woody Pascal answer due 3/6/2020; State Of New York answer due 3/6/2020; Ruthanne Visnauskas answer due 3/6/2020. (jca)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/14/2020) (jca)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Rachel K. Moston dated 2/14/2020. Document filed by City Of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael A. Berg dated 2/14/20. Document filed by Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Adam Berg on behalf of Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. City Of New York served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; City of Yonkers served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020; County Of Westchester served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020; Letitia James served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; Woody Pascal served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; State Of New York served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; Ruthanne Visnauskas served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by various individuals; see affidavits. Document filed by Dexter Guerrieri; 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC; 1139 Longfellow, LLC; G-Max Management, Inc.; 447-9 16th LLC; 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC; Green Valley Realty, LLC; 125 Holding LLC; Brooklyn 637-240 LLC; Siljay Holding LLC; 66 East 190 LLC; Jane Ordway; 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC..(Mastro, Randy)
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 28, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-11285-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William John Moccia on behalf of 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC. (Moccia, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Akiva Shapiro on behalf of 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC. (Shapiro, Akiva)
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, City of Yonkers, County Of Westchester, Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas. (dnh)
January 24, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:19-cv-11285-KMK. (dnh)
January 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randy M. Mastro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (dnh)
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randy M. Mastro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of Yonkers. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Siljay Holding LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Green Valley Realty, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by G-Max Management, Inc..(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brooklyn 637-240 LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1139 Longfellow, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 447-9 16th LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 66 East 190 LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 125 Holding LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, Letitia James, Ruthanne Visnauskas, Woody Pascal, City of New York, County of Westchester and City of Yonkers, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rider to Summons)(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-11285. Document filed by 1139 Longfellow, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC, 447-9 16th LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., Green Valley Realty, LLC, Dexter Guerrieri, Jane Ordway, Siljay Holding LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider to Civil Cover Sheet)(Mastro, Randy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York, City of Yonkers, County Of Westchester, Letitia James, Woody Pascal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18584631)Document filed by Dexter Guerrieri, 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC, 1139 Longfellow, LLC, G-Max Management, Inc., 447-9 16th LLC, 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC, Green Valley Realty, LLC, 125 Holding LLC, Brooklyn 637-240 LLC, Siljay Holding LLC, 66 East 190 LLC, Jane Ordway, 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC.(Mastro, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G-Max Management, Inc. et al v. State Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: City of Yonkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1139 Longfellow, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Ordway
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2114 Haviland Associates, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 447-9 16th LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Valley Realty, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4250 Van Cortlandt Park East Associates, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn 637-240 LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 125 Holding LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Guerrieri
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 181 W. Tremont Associates, LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 66 East 190 LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siljay Holding LLC
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G-Max Management, Inc.
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Westchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthanne Visnauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Pascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?