BMG Monroe I, LLC v. Village of Monroe
Plaintiff: BMG Monroe I, LLC
Defendant: Village of Monroe
Case Number: 7:2020cv01357
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Village of Monroe answer due 5/15/2020. (va)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 10). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/13/2020) (va)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Alexander Eleftherakis dated March 12, 2020. Document filed by Village of Monroe..(Eleftherakis, Alexander)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis on behalf of Village of Monroe..(Eleftherakis, Alexander)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Dorfman on behalf of Village of Monroe..(Dorfman, Leo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Sokoloff on behalf of Village of Monroe..(Sokoloff, Brian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. Village of Monroe served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Ann Margaret Baxter, Deputy Clerk. Document filed by BMG Monroe I, LLC..(Rosborough, Robert)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosborough, Robert)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Village of Monroe..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Stevenson Rosborough to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the first page of the form was not uploaded. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Village of Monroe, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by BMG Monroe I, LLC..(Rosborough, Robert)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosborough, Robert) Modified on 2/18/2020 (dnh).
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Village of Monroe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18818302)Document filed by BMG Monroe I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015.08.10 Town Reso Granting Conditional Final Approvals, #2 Exhibit B - 2015.08.10 Village Reso Granting Conditional Final Approvals, #3 Exhibit C - 2006.06.19 SEQRA Findings Statement, #4 Exhibit D - 2006.09.14 Town Reso Granting Preliminary Approvals, #5 Exhibit E - 2006.08.21 Village Reso Granting Preliminary Approvals, #6 Exhibit F - 2014.07.24 OC Planning Dept Reply Approving Site Plan, #7 Exhibit G - 2015.08.10 Amended SEQRA Findings Statement, #8 Exhibit H - Emily Convers Comments, #9 Exhibit I - Proposed moratorium local law, #10 Exhibit J - GML 239 County Response to proposed local law, #11 Exhibit K - BMG written comments to proposed local law, #12 Exhibit L - developer written comments to proposed local law, #13 Exhibit M - resident written comments to proposed local law, #14 Exhibit N - Local Law #1-2016 Moratorium, #15 Exhibit O - Village of Monroe 3-2016, #16 Exhibit P - Village of Monroe 2-2017, #17 Exhibit Q - Village of Monroe 4-2017, #18 Exhibit R - Village of Monroe 3-2018, #19 Exhibit S - Ltr to Village of Monroe 9.12.17, #20 Exhibit T - Levinson to JJH responding to 91217 Letter 091417, #21 Exhibit U - Mayor Ltr 10.19.17, #22 Exhibit V - Ltr to S. Bonacic 10.24.17, #23 Exhibit W - Cover Ltr to James Cocks with Building Permit Applications 2.1.18, #24 Exhibit X - Building Inspector letter 05 07 18, #25 Exhibit Y - Drawings for Lots 45 and 46 and Drawing A1, #26 Exhibit Z - Ltr to Village of Monroe ZBA re DEIS siding 11.2.18, #27 Exhibit AA - ZBA Decision 12 11 18, #28 Exhibit BB - Site Plan Amendment Application (Part 1), #29 Exhibit BB - Site Plan Amendment Application (Part 2), #30 Exhibit BB - Site Plan Amendment Application (Part 3), #31 Exhibit CC - Planning Board Minutes 2019.09.11, #32 Exhibit DD - Draft Local Law #7 of 2018 FAR, #33 Exhibit EE - Ltr to Village of Monroe re LL 7 of 2018 10.15.18, #34 Exhibit FF - BOT Minutes 2017.10.03).(Rosborough, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMG Monroe I, LLC v. Village of Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Monroe
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Monroe I, LLC
Represented By: Robert Stevenson Rosborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?