Doshna v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Doshna
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv02925
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a telephone conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on June 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibels Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Metro-North Railroad Company served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. Service was accepted by Richard Gans, General Counsel. Document filed by Ronald Doshna..(Perry, Scott)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perry, Scott)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Railroad Company..(jgo)
April 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Scott E. Perry. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ronald Doshna..(Perry, Scott)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19389598)Document filed by Ronald Doshna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Perry, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doshna v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Doshna
Represented By: Scott E. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?