American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Uplift Elevator of NY Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Jermaine Hickson, Hamilton Heights Cluster Associates, L.P. and Uplift Elevator of NY Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv03246
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an inquest hearing shall be held on February 4, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The hearing will be held as a video conference using the Skype for Business platform. The information necessary to access the video conference will be provided via email. Due to the limited capacity of the Skype for Business system, only one counsel per party may participate in the video conference. Co-counsel, members of the press, and the public may access the audio feed of the conference by calling (888) 557-8511 and entering access code 4862532. ( Inquest Hearing set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/22/2021) (va)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DEFAULT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an order of default is entered against Defendants Uplift, Hamilton Heights, and Hickson. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Fox for a report and recommendation regarding Plaintiff's request for damages, an award of attorneys' fees, and certain declaratory relief. The Clerk of Court is directed not to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/30/2020) (jca)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The hearing scheduled for October 29, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the teleph one conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties lines. Seven days before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using t o dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. Plaintiff is directed to serve this Order on Defendants by October 7, 2020 and to file proof of service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/2/2020) (jca)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The August 27, 2020 conference is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/12/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Uplift Elevator of NY Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Hickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Heights Cluster Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uplift Elevator of NY Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?