Vozzolo v. Air Canada
Plaintiff: Emilio L. Vozzolo
Defendant: Air Canada
Case Number: 7:2020cv03503
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Air Canada waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. Document filed by Emilio L. Vozzolo..(Kravec, Joseph)
June 25, 2020 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Civil Cover Sheet, Class Action Complaint and Summons in Civil Action mailed to Air Canada 7373 Cote-Boulevard West Saint-Laurent, Quebec H4S 1Z3 Canada on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 1278 6843, as per #6 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,RECEIVED ON: 6/25/2020. (smc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of translator mailed to Air Canada 7373 Cote-Boulevard West Saint-Laurent, Quebec H4S 1Z3 Canada on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 1278 6843, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antonio Vozzolo on behalf of Emilio L. Vozzolo..(Vozzolo, Antonio)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Air Canada..(pc)
May 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Nicholas Kravec. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Emilio L. Vozzolo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Air Canada, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emilio L. Vozzolo..(Kravec, Joseph)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kravec, Joseph)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Canada. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19715078)Document filed by Emilio L. Vozzolo..(Kravec, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vozzolo v. Air Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio L. Vozzolo
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Kravec
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?