Mendez-Lopez v. Back et al
Plaintiff: Wilner Mendez-Lopez
Defendant: Yoon H. Back and Paul S. Back
Case Number: 7:2020cv04444
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on September 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., by telephone conference. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831..(ks) Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul S. Back, Yoon H. Back..(Schoene, Ralph)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul S. Back..(pc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yoon H. Back..(pc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul S. Back, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yoon H. Back, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kevin D. O'Dell to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title for both summonses must be exactly the same;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul S. Back, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin) Modified on 6/11/2020 (pc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yoon H. Back, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin) Modified on 6/11/2020 (pc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Dell, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul S. Back, Yoon H. Back. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20193152)Document filed by Wilner Mendez-Lopez..(O'Dell, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez-Lopez v. Back et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoon H. Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilner Mendez-Lopez
Represented By: Kevin D. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?