Regina Industries, Inc. v. Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.
Plaintiff: Regina Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.
Case Number: 7:2020cv04887
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 1004 940 2 on 7/16/2020. (mml)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT AND ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that this action is remanded back to state court, Supreme Court of New York, County of Westchester, Index No.: 55546/2020, and all matters currently scheduled in this federal action are taken off the calendar. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/15/2020) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance CO...(Barnas, Brian)
June 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (wb)
June 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Patrick V. Deiorio, counsel for plaintiff on 6/25/20. Document filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance CO...(Barnas, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance CO...(Barnas, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barnas, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Westchester. Case Number: 55546/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20424408).Document filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Index of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Complaint).(Barnas, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regina Industries, Inc. v. Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.
Represented By: Brian D. Barnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?