Graziano v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jenna Graziano
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation
Case Number: 7:2020cv05049
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332lr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Wisconsin acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:20-cv-01315, filed on 08/26/2020. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of wisconsin.(ks)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court held a telephonic pre-motion conference on August 25, 2020. During the conference, the parties consented to transferring this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee Division. Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is instructed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee Division, and terminate this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/25/2020) (ks) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2020. All parties appeared via telephone. All parties consented to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. A separate Order shall be entered by the Court. (bk)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' pre-motion conference letter in anticipation of moving to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 6) and Plaintiff's response thereto (Doc. 11). The Court shall hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on August 25, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. At the time of the scheduled conference all parties shall call (888) 398-2342; access code: 3456831. The Clerk is instructed to terminate ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/10/2020) Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (ks)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Shannon Liss-Riordan dated August 7, 2020 re: #6 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated August 4, 2020. . Document filed by Jenna Graziano..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Joel C. Griswold to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Add Applicant(s) Joel C. Griswold. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/6/2020) (ks)
August 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 FIRST MOTION for Joel Christopher Griswold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20996894. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. MOTION to Add Applicant(s) Joel Christopher Griswold .. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Bonnie Keane DelGobbo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/5/2020) (ks)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Joel Christopher Griswold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20996894. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., MOTION to Add Applicant(s) Joel Christopher Griswold .( Return Date set for 8/5/2020 at 09:00 AM.) Document filed by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Declaration with Certificates of Good Standing with Exhibits A & B, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Griswold, Joel)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 AMENDED MOTION for Bonnie Keane DelGobbo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office s. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Bonnie Keane DelGobbo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bonnie Keane DelGobbo in Support of Corrected Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated August 4, 2020. Document filed by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc...(Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda)
August 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Bonnie Keane DelGobbo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20974780. Motion and supporting papers.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Bonnie Keane DelGobbo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20974780. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bonnie Keane DelGobbo).(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Document filed by Jenna Graziano..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kohl's Corporation waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Document filed by Jenna Graziano..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
July 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20508589)Document filed by Jenna Graziano..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graziano v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Graziano
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel C Griswold
Represented By: Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel C Griswold
Represented By: Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?