Kamal v. G E R Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Syed Kamal
Defendant: George Roach, G E R Industries, Inc., Robert-George Realty Corp. and GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2020cv05671
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/13/2020..(rpr)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: By 10/12/2020, counsel shall file on the ECF docket their proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (pp)
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR A TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 10/19/2020 at 2:30 p.m. All counsel and/or parties shall use the following information to appear at the conference by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662 Access Code: 1703567. Initial Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Telephone Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp...(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp...(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by G E R Industries, Inc...(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated..(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: By 9/1/2020, defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (pp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Zucco on behalf of G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp...(Zucco, Sarah)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Mary Ellen Donnelly dated 08/24/2020. Document filed by G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp.. Return Date set for 9/1/2020 at 11:59 PM..(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Ellen Donnelly on behalf of G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp...(Donnelly, Mary Ellen)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel F Murphy, Jr on behalf of G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp...(Murphy, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. George Roach served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by "JOHN SMITH", CO-WORKER. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Phillips, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert-George Realty Corp. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Phillips, William)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Phillips, William)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. G E R Industries, Inc. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Phillips, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Roach..(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert-George Realty Corp...(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated..(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to G E R Industries, Inc...(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Roach, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Fingerhut, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert-George Realty Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Fingerhut, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Fingerhut, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to G E R Industries, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Syed Kamal..(Fingerhut, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fingerhut, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G E R Industries, Inc., GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated, George Roach, Robert-George Realty Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20799872)Document filed by Syed Kamal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Right to Sue).(Fingerhut, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamal v. G E R Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Roach
Represented By: Mary Ellen Donnelly
Represented By: Sarah Zucco
Represented By: Daniel F Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E R Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Donnelly
Represented By: Sarah Zucco
Represented By: Daniel F Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert-George Realty Corp.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Donnelly
Represented By: Sarah Zucco
Represented By: Daniel F Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GER Architectural Manufacturing Incorporated
Represented By: Mary Ellen Donnelly
Represented By: Sarah Zucco
Represented By: Daniel F Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Kamal
Represented By: Steven John Fingerhut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?