Lora-Ruiz v. Montefiore Nyack Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Lora-Ruiz
Defendant: Charity Catania, Sound Inpatient Physicians, Montefiore Nyack Hospital and Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv05673
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Charity Catania waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Document filed by Leslie Lora-Ruiz..(Brock, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Document filed by Leslie Lora-Ruiz..(Brock, Timothy)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Charity Catania answer due 10/28/2020; Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc. answer due 10/28/2020. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/26/2020) (jca)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert A. Jaffe dated August 26, 2020. Document filed by Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc.. Return Date set for 8/27/2020 at 10:00 AM..(Jaffe, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc...(Jaffe, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Jaffe on behalf of Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc...(Jaffe, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy J. Brock. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:2617; Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:621; the Dollar Demand has been modified to omitted; the County code has been modified to Rockland. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy J. Brock. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sound Inpatient Physicians. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
July 23, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20813228..(Brock, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Timothy J. Brock. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 7/28/2020..(dnh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brock, Timothy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charity Catania, Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Sound Inpatient Physicians. Document filed by Leslie Lora-Ruiz..(Brock, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lora-Ruiz v. Montefiore Nyack Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Catania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Inpatient Physicians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Nyack Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Lora-Ruiz
Represented By: Timothy J. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?