Harnish v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shelby Harnish
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. and Cooper Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv05942
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Shelby Harnish. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kassan, Randi)
September 17, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shelby Harnish. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kassan, Randi)
September 17, 2020 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Shelby Harnish. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 9/17/2020 (km).
September 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Randi Kassan. RE-FILE Document No. #23 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
September 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Philip M. Halpern for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Specialist Service Leader. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Teva Women's Health LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by Curtis Sweltz, Project manager. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by Curtis Sweltz, Project manager. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by Curtis Sweltz, Project manager. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by Curtis Sweltz, Project manager. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Document filed by Shelby Harnish., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO ESTABLISH RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS DEADLINES granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants The Cooper Companies, Inc., and CooperSurgical, Inc., are granted an extension until September 29, 2020, or twenty-one days after service upon them of an amended complaint to be filed by Plaintiff, to file responsive pleadings; as further set forth in this Order. The parties are reminded to review and comply with my Individual Practices in future submissions to the Court. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (Doc. 15). (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/10/2020) (cf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responsive Pleadings. Document filed by Shelby Harnish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Kassan, Randi)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health LLC..(dnh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health, Inc...(dnh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc...(dnh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(dnh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CooperSurgical, Inc...(dnh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cooper Companies, Inc...(dnh)
July 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Sullivan. (dnh)
July 31, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Cooper Companies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
July 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 31, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CooperSurgical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20928863)Document filed by Shelby Harnish..(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harnish v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Harnish
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?