Great American Insurance Company v. Ceasefire Protection
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Ceasefire Protection, Ceasefire Protection, Inc., Ceasefire, Inc. and Cease Fire Sprinkler Company, LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Ceasefire Protection a/k/a Ceasefire Protection Inc., Ceasefire Inc., and/or Ceasefire Sprinkler Company, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv06327
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 07:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern by telephone conference. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831, and as further set forth in this notice.(jwh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ceasefire Protection..(Kolbe, George)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ceasefire Protection..(Kolbe, George)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Spencer Kolbe, Jr on behalf of Ceasefire Protection..(Kolbe, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group for Great American Insurance Company. Document filed by Great American Insurance Company..(Church, Timothy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Church, Timothy)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy Gerard Church. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Timothy Gerard Church. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
August 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy Gerard Church. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Great American Insurance Company; Ceasefire Protection. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ceasefire Protection a/k/a Ceasefire Protection Inc., Ceasefire Inc., and/or Ceasefire Sprinkler Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21108319)Document filed by Great American Insurance Company..(Church, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Ceasefire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Ceasefire Protection a/k/a Ceasefire Protection Inc., Ceasefire Inc., and/or Ceasefire Sprinkler Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Gerard Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceasefire Protection
Represented By: George Spencer Kolbe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceasefire Protection, Inc.
Represented By: George Spencer Kolbe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceasefire, Inc.
Represented By: George Spencer Kolbe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cease Fire Sprinkler Company, LLC
Represented By: George Spencer Kolbe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?