Rojas v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nikkia Rojas
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Womens Heath, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. and Teva Women's Health, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv06448
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health, LLC. (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CooperSurgical, Inc.. (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (sj)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Coopersurgical, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each request is its own separate event or you can list all defendants in the "TO" field on ONE summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC.; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC.; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC;TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.; THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.; COOPERSURGICAL, INC., re: #9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas.(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 10/6/2020 (sj).
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nikkia Rojas. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kassan, Randi)
August 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name error in caption (Teva Women's Heath, LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas.(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas.(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CooperSurgical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/14/2020 (sj).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Womens Heath, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21154856)Document filed by Nikkia Rojas..(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Heath, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikkia Rojas
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?