Jiang et al v. Kim et al
Plaintiff: Xianhua Lin, Hong Jiang, Yingying Zhao and Yan Liu
Defendant: Lihua Han, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc, Miseon Kim, Mina Kim, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc doing business as Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions and Eva Han
Case Number: 7:2020cv06531
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The initial conference scheduled for 10/15/2020 is adjourned to 11/23/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will separately docket a Mediation Referral Order. The parties are directed to file a joint letter concerning the status of settlement/mediation by 11/9/2020. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/9/2020) Initial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (ks)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO-ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/19/2020. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/9/2020) (ks)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Diane H. Lee dated 10.8.2020. Document filed by Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc..(Lee, Diane)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Hong Jiang, Xianhua Lin, Yan Liu, Yingying Zhao. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Schedule).(Dong, Adam)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on October 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., by telephone conference. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. (As further set forth in this Notice.) Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (cf) Modified on 9/4/2020 (cf).
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc..(Lee, Diane)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Yingying Zhao..(Dong, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Yan Liu..(Dong, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Xianhua Lin..(Dong, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Hong Jiang..(Dong, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Hwakyung Lee on behalf of Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc..(Lee, Diane)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Miseon Kim served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Lihua Han. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yingying Zhao; Hong Jiang; Yan Liu; Xianhua Lin..(Dong, Adam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lihua Han served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Lihua Han. Document filed by Yingying Zhao; Hong Jiang; Yan Liu; Xianhua Lin..(Dong, Adam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Lihua Han, receptionist/manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yingying Zhao; Hong Jiang; Yan Liu; Xianhua Lin..(Dong, Adam)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Xin Dong. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yingying Zhao, Hong Jiang, Yan Liu, Xianhua Lin, Lihua Han, Miseon Kim, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lihua Han, Miseon Kim, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc..(pne)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miseon Kim, Lihua Han, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hong Jiang, Xianhua Lin, Yan Liu, Yingying Zhao..(Dong, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dong, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lihua Han, Miseon Kim, Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21184637)Document filed by Yingying Zhao, Hong Jiang, Yan Liu, Xianhua Lin. (Attachments: #1 Document Preservation Notice, #2 Inspection of Records Notice, #3 Shareholder Liability Notice, #4 Notice of Lien and Assignment).(Dong, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiang et al v. Kim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xianhua Lin
Represented By: Adam Xin Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Jiang
Represented By: Adam Xin Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yingying Zhao
Represented By: Adam Xin Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Liu
Represented By: Adam Xin Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lihua Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miseon Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions Inc doing business as Lash Belle Eyelash Extensions
Represented By: Diane Hwakyung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?