Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing v. Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U.
Plaintiff: Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing and Pine Valley Center, LLC doing business as Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing
Defendant: Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U. and Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO
Case Number: 7:2020cv06645
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839. Access Code: 5999739. The parties should call in from a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/7/2020). Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-04006-PMH, 7:20-cv-06645-PMH (rjm)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. Please note Judge Davison's COVID-19 Order (docketed separately) setting forth procedures applicable to all civil cases. Counsel are encouraged, but not required, to submit a confidential, ex parte letter to the Court, not to exceed 5 pages in length, no later than two (2) business days prior to the conference, outlining any information counsel believes would assist the Court in preparation for the conference. Until further notice, any such ex parte letter must be emailed to: ChambersNYSDDavison@nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall notify all other parties of their intention to submit an ex parte letter no later than one week prior to the conference. PLEASE NOTIFY ALL OTHER PARTIES OF THE ABOVE INFORMATION IMMEDIATELY. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-04006-PMH, 7:20-cv-06645-PMH (rj)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-04006-PMH, 7:20-cv-06645-PMH (ks)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Pine Valley Center, LLC d/b/a Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing v. Local 679, Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO, Case No. 20-CV-06645, is consolidated into the above-captioned casethe first filed casefor all purposes, pursuant to Rule 13(c)(1) of the Southern District Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges. The Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed in the above-captioned case (Doc. 20) is adopted for both matters. An Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Davison shall be docketed separately. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-04006-PMH, 7:20-cv-06645-PMH (ks)
October 1, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 7:20-cv-04006-PMH.. (ks)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Keith Wolf on behalf of Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO..(Wolf, William)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND: Plaintiff Pine Valley Center, LLC d/b/a Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing ("Plaintiff"), through its attorneys Hinman, Howard & Kattell, and Defendant Local No. 670, Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, RWDSU, AFL-CIO ("Defendant"), through its attorneys Rothman Rocco LaRuffa LLP, hereby stipulate and agree that the time for Defendant to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including November 6,2020. SO ORDERED. Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO answer due 11/6/2020., Motions terminated: #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (On Consent) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from William Wolf (Jt. Stipulation) dated September 10, 2020. filed by Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/11/2020) (jca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (On Consent) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from William Wolf (Jt. Stipulation) dated September 10, 2020. Document filed by Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO..(Wolf, William)
August 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 25, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cv-04006-PMH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO. (sj)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firement, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pine Valley Center, LLC..(Lanouette, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dawn Joyce Lanouette to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the full party name as to whom the summons is being requested must be listed in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Philip M. Halpern as possibly related to 7:20-cv-04006-PMH. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dawn Joyce Lanouette. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 5:7101. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:185. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pine Valley Center, LLC..(Lanouette, Dawn) Modified on 8/20/2020 (dnh).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Dawn J Lanouette re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-4006. Document filed by Pine Valley Center, LLC..(Lanouette, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pine Valley Center, LLC..(Lanouette, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lanouette, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Dawn Joyce Lanouette. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dawn Joyce Lanouette. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U. ; Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21231805)Document filed by Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing..(Lanouette, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing v. Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 670 Stationary Engineers, Firemen, Maintenance and Building Service Union, R.W.D.S.U., AFL-CIO
Represented By: William Keith Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing
Represented By: Dawn Joyce Lanouette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Valley Center, LLC doing business as Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation And Nursing
Represented By: Dawn Joyce Lanouette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?