H.Y. et al v. Bob'S Furniture Restorations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: H.Y., an Infant by Her Mother and Natural Guardian, Genesis Yasin, Genesis Yasin and H.Y.
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC, ABC Corporations 1-10 (The latter names being fictitious and used to connote unidentified entities responsible for this occurrence), Bob's Discount Furniture Freeport, Bob's Discount Furniture And Mattress Store, Bob'S Furniture Restorations, Inc. and ABC Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 7:2020cv06798
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (ad)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lainer, Allyson)
August 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Allyson Beth Lainer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: H.Y., an Infant by Her Mother and Natural Guardian, Genesis Yasin; ABC Corporations 1-10 (The latter names being fictitious and used to connote unidentified entities responsible for this occurrence). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
August 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Allyson Beth Lainer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Attachments served on Sobo & Sobo on ugust 24, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bob's Discount Furniture And Mattress Store, Bob's Discount Furniture Freeport, Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC..(Lainer, Allyson)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BDF Acquisition Corporation for Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC. Document filed by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC..(Lainer, Allyson)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lainer, Allyson) Modified on 8/25/2020 (jgo).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange County. Case Number: EF000186-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21295732).Document filed by Bob's Discount Furniture Freeport, Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC, Bob'S Furniture Restorations, Inc., Bob's Discount Furniture And Mattress Store. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Response to Damages, #4 Exhibit D- Stipulation).(Lainer, Allyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.Y. et al v. Bob'S Furniture Restorations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10 (The latter names being fictitious and used to connote unidentified entities responsible for this occurrence)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture Freeport
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture And Mattress Store
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob'S Furniture Restorations, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.Y., an Infant by Her Mother and Natural Guardian, Genesis Yasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Yasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.Y.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?