Desir v. USPS et al
Plaintiff: Pierre E. Desir
Defendant: Anthony J. Pisani and USPS
Case Number: 7:2020cv07324
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Pierre E. Desir and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pierre E. Desir. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
September 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/28/2020. Responses due by 12/1/2020, Replies due by 12/15/2020. (jca)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER terminating #4 LETTER MOTION for Conference for proposed Motion to Dismiss. Government Motion is due 10/28/20. Plaintiff's response is due 12/1/20. Government's reply is due 12/15/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/2020) (jca)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Conference for proposed Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joshua Kahane dated 9/16/20. Document filed by Anthony J. Pisani, USPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Kahane, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff on 9/10/20. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Anthony J. Pisani, USPS..(Kahane, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Evan Kahane. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kahane, Joshua)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 033513/2020..Document filed by USPS, Anthony J. Pisani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Strauss Certification).(Kahane, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desir v. USPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre E. Desir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Pisani
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?