Quezada et al v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Yinoy Quezada and Randy Andy Rodriguez
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv08038
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant shall answer or move by January 4, 2021. The Clerk is instructed to terminate ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/20/2020) United States Of America answer due 1/4/2021 (ks)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 11/19/2020. Document filed by United States Of America..(Sun, Anthony)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Of America..(Sun, Anthony)
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Yvette Maduro, Chief Ambulatory Officer. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Of America served on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Service was accepted by Yvette Maduro, Chief Ambulatory Officer. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada; Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Of America served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada; Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Keith Joseph Clarke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clarke, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21887055)Document filed by Yinoy Quezada, Randy Andy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTCA Claim- Yinoy Quezada, #2 Exhibit FTCA Claim- Randy Andy Rodriguez, #3 Exhibit DHHS Denial Letter).(Clarke, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yinoy Quezada
Represented By: Keith Joseph Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Andy Rodriguez
Represented By: Keith Joseph Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?