Salazar v. Cuetes Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Salazar
Defendant: Cuetes Corp. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 7:2020cv08167
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, December 8, 2020 at 11: 15 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/24/2020) (jca)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ANSWER served on JOSE SALAZAR on 11/18/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Cuetes Corp...(Roman, Hector)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cuetes Corp...(Roman, Hector)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 FINAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cuetes Corp...(Roman, Hector)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cuetes Corp. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. Service was accepted by SUE ZOUKY. Document filed by Jose Salazar..(Weisenberg, Benjamin)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cuetes Corp...(dnh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cuetes Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Salazar..(Weisenberg, Benjamin)
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Benjamin D Weisenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title does not include both defendants;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin D Weisenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Salazar. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
October 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cuetes Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Salazar..(Weisenberg, Benjamin) Modified on 10/2/2020 (pc).
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weisenberg, Benjamin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cuetes Corp., Does 1-50. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21939956)Document filed by Jose Salazar..(Weisenberg, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Cuetes Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuetes Corp.
Represented By: Hector M. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Salazar
Represented By: Benjamin D Weisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?