GEICO Indemnity Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur and GEICO Indemnity Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv08493
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so redesignated. (wb)
October 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Valerie E. Caproni is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America (FBI), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company..(Elem, Richard)
October 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard Levi Elem to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name as to whom the summons is being issued must exactly match the party of record. The party name listed in the defendant 'To:' section of the PDF must be a party listed in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
October 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Levi Elem. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Levi Elem. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 350 (Motor Vehicle); Dollar Demand omitted. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 380 (Personal Property: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $12,000. (dnh)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Heinz, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Benjamin Moore & CO., Other Affiliate Helzberg Diamonds, Other Affiliate GEICO Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Geico Advantage Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Secure Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Choice Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate ACME BRICK COMPANY, Other Affiliate BEN BRIDGE JEWELER, Other Affiliate BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES, Other Affiliate BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY ENERGY COMPANY, Other Affiliate BORSHEIM'S FINE JEWELRY, Other Affiliate BUFFALO NEWS, BUFFALO NY, Other Affiliate CORT BUSINESS SERVICES, Other Affiliate CTB INC., Other Affiliate FECHHEIMER BROTHERS COMPANY, Other Affiliate FOREST RIVER, Other Affiliate FRUIT OF THE LOOM COMPANIES, Other Affiliate GARAN INCORPORATED, Other Affiliate GATEWAY UNDERWRITERS AGENCY, Other Affiliate GENERAL RE, Other Affiliate H.H. BROWN SHOE GROUP, Other Affiliate HOMESERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., Other Affiliate INTERNATIONAL DAIRY QUEEN, INC., Other Affiliate IMC INTERNATIONAL METALWORKING COMPANIES, Other Affiliate JORDAN'S FURNITURE, Other Affiliate JUSTIN BRANDS, Other Affiliate MEDICAL PROTECTIVE, Other Affiliate MITEK INC., Other Affiliate NEBRASKA FURNITURE MART, Other Affiliate NETJETS, Other Affiliate THE PAMPERED CHEF, Other Affiliate PRECISION STEEL WAREHOUSE, INC., Other Affiliate RC WILLEY HOME FURNISHINGS, Other Affiliate SCOTT FETZER COMPANIES, Other Affiliate SEE'S CANDIES, Other Affiliate STAR FURNITURE, Other Affiliate TTI INC., Other Affiliate XTRA CORPORATION, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance, Other Affiliate BH Media Group, Other Affiliate Business Wire, Other Affiliate Central States Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Clayton Homes, Other Affiliate FlightSafety, Other Affiliate Guard Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Johns Manville, Other Affiliate Larson-Juhl, Other Affiliate McLane Company, Other Affiliate Oriental Trading Company, Other Affiliate Richline Group, Other Affiliate Shaw Industries, Other Affiliate Applied Underwriters, Other Affiliate GEICO General Insurance Company, Other Affiliate BNSF, Other Affiliate Brooks, Other Affiliate United States Liability Insurance Group, Other Affiliate BoatU.S., Other Affiliate Lubrizol Corporation for GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur. Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporations List).(Elem, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America (FBI), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur..(Elem, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2020 (dnh).
October 12, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America (US Attorney General), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur..(Elem, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America (US Attorney), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur..(Elem, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Elem, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22090702)Document filed by GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D).(Elem, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO Indemnity Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company as subrogee of Paramjit Kaur
Represented By: Richard Levi Elem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard Levi Elem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?