Power Up Lending Group LTD v. THC Therapeutic Incet al
Plaintiff: POWER UP LENDING GROUP LTD.
Defendant: TRANSHARE CORPORATION, Brandon Romanek, Parker Mitchell, THC THERAPEUTICS INC and THC Therapeutic Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv11064
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO DISCONTINUANCE ACTION: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that I, Jeffrey Davis, Esq. of Davis & Associates P.C. the attorney of record for the above-named Defendants with respect to the above captioned matter and on behalf of my client, I hereby discontinue the above captioned matter without prejudice, so that this can be re-filed in the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/2021) (mml)
January 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Kenneth M. Karas for approval for the following reason(s): the notice of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i);. (dt)
January 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Kevin Davis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case - Other. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441nr. (gp)
January 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Davis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Power Up Lending Group LTD., THC Therapeutic Inc. and Transhare Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by All Defendants. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Davis, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. Case Number: 614700-2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23272626).Document filed by Parker Mitchell, THC THERAPEUTICS INC, Brandon Romanek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit exhibit A to complaint, #3 Exhibit exhibit B to complaint, #4 Exhibit exhibit C to complaint, #5 Exhibit exhibit D to complaint, #6 Exhibit exhibit E to complaint, #7 Exhibit exhibit F to complaint, #8 Exhibit exhibit G to complaint, #9 Exhibit exhibit H to complaint, #10 Exhibit exhibit I to complaint, #11 Exhibit exhibit J to complaint, #12 Exhibit exhibit K to complaint, #13 Exhibit exhibit L to complaint).(Davis, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Up Lending Group LTD v. THC Therapeutic Incet al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POWER UP LENDING GROUP LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSHARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Romanek
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Mitchell
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THC THERAPEUTICS INC
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THC Therapeutic Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?