Broad Coverage Service, Inc. et al v. Oriska Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: DYNAMIC CLAIM SERVICES INC., BROAD COVERAGE SERVICE, INC, Dynamic Claim Services, Inc. and Broad Coverage Service, Inc.
Defendant: Oriska Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Caring Companion Services, Inc., Caring Professionals, Comfort Loving, Diamond Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC, Eastchester, Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,, Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care, Bayview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Allstate ASO Inc., BAYPARK CENTER NURSING AND REHABILITATION, ORISKA INSURANCE, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care, Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC, Nassau Extended Care Facility, Sentosa Care, LLC, West Lawrence Care Center, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation, Inc., SC & BP Services, Inc, Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center, Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Brookside Multicare Nursing Center, White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, Annette Hall, Edison Home Health Care, LLC, Caring Professionals, Rosewood Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Park Avenue Extended Care Facility, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Donna Hodge, Living Waters Home Care Agency, HCS Home Care, Sunharbor Acquisition, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Inc, Nathan Miller a/k/a NMC Acquisition, LLC, Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Harry's Nurses Registry, Inc, Harbour Health MulticareCenter a/k/a Receiver Services, LLC, Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation, Comfort Loving, Palffy Group LLC, Laconia Nursing Home, Inc., Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care, Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility, The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation, Garden Care Center, Inc., Mrs. Mary's Place HCS Inc., Pharney Group LLC, Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation, New Carlton Rehab & Nursing Center, Preferred Home Care of NY, Caring Companion Services, Inc., Grace Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation a/k/a Pinegrove Manor, LLC, Norwich Rehabilitation and Nursing Center and Diamond Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: RASHBI MANAGEMENT INC and Rashbi Management, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv11108
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446pr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #6 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge, Karen Grant Williams. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Kernan, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT from #6 Memorandum & Opinion. Form 7 and Form 22 are due within 14 days. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878039. (Kernan, James) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tp).
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Kernan, James to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the appeal. Re-file the appeal using the event type Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
February 9, 2021 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen Grant Williams, Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Alexi Arias were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
February 9, 2021 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #12 Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-23878039, paid on 2/9/2021. (tp)
February 9, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #12 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Walter Freudenberg on behalf of Broad Coverage Service, Inc., Dynamic Claim Services, Inc...(Freudenberg, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #6 Memorandum & Opinion,, Remand. . Document filed by Broad Coverage Service, Inc., Dynamic Claim Services, Inc...(Freudenberg, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael W. Freudenberg in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #6 Memorandum & Opinion,, Remand.. Document filed by Broad Coverage Service, Inc., Dynamic Claim Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Freudenberg, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #6 Memorandum & Opinion,, Remand. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge, Karen Grant Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Third Party Complaint, #6 Answer, #7 JPML Notice and Motion, #8 JPML MOL, #9 EDNY Caption, #10 SDNY Caption, #11 NDNY Caption, #12 Case Law).(Kernan, James)
January 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Kernan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Oriska Insurance Company; Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care; Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation; Donna Hodge; Caring Companion Services, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
January 12, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Caring Professionals, Comfort Loving, Diamond Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Edison Home Health Care, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc., Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC, Grace Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation a/k/a Pinegrove Manor, LLC, Harbour Health MulticareCenter a/k/a Receiver Services, LLC, Harry's Nurses Registry, Inc, HCS Home Care, Laconia Nursing Home, Inc., Little Neck Care Center, LLC, Living Waters Home Care Agency, Mrs. Mary's Place HCS Inc., Nassau Extended Care Facility, Nathan Miller a/k/a NMC Acquisition, LLC, New Carlton Rehab & Nursing Center, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC, Norwich Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Palffy Group LLC, Park Avenue Extended Care Facility, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by Donna Hodge. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,..(Kernan, James)
January 12, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC, West Lawrence Care Center, LLC, Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation, Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility, The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation, Sunharbor Acquisition, LLC, Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care, Sentosa Care, LLC, SC & BP Services, Inc, Rosewood Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Preferred Home Care of NY, Pharney Group LLC, Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Inc, Park Avenue Extended Care Facility added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by Donna Hodge. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,..(Kernan, James)
January 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James Kernan re: Document No. #4 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; All parties must be added individually; Caring Companion Services, Inc., Caring Professionals, Comfort Loving, Diamond Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care, Edison Home Health Care, LLC, Garden Care Center, Inc,Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care, Grace Plaza Nursing andRehabilitation a/k/a Pinegrove Manor, LLC, Harbour Health MulticareCenter a/k/a Receiver Services, LLC, Harry's Nurses Registry, Inc., HCSHome Care, Laconia Nursing Home, Inc.,Little Neck Care Center, LLC,Living Waters Home Care Agency, Mrs. Mary's Place HCS, NassauExtended Care Facility, Nathan Miller a/k/a NMC Acquisition, LLC, NewCarlton Rehab & Nursing Center, New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC,Norwich Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Palffy Group LLC, ParkAvenue Extended Care Facility, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Inc.,Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Pharney Group LLC, PreferredHome Care of NY, Rosewood Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, SC &BP Services, Inc., Sentosa Care, LLC, Spring Creek Rehabilitation &Nursing Care, Sunharbor Acquisition, LLC, The Hamptons Center forRehabilitation, Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility, Townhouse Center forRehabilitation, West Lawrence Care Center, LLC, White Plains Center forNursing, LLC, Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc., Annette Hall; Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
January 11, 2021 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rockland. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E533710053433 on 1/12/2021..(ks)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 2:20-cv-06291 filed with the Joint Panel. filed by Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,.For the foregoing reasons this case is REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rockland. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rockland, and to close this action. All pending matters are hereby terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/11/2021) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 2:20-cv-06291 filed with the Joint Panel. Document filed by Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,. (Attachments: #1 schedule of related actions, #2 Memorandum of Law).(Kernan, James)
January 8, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so redesignated. (laq)
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Kernan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 34480/13..Document filed by Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order).(Kernan, James)
January 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James Kernan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; All parties must be listed in caption, "et al" is not accepted (Third Party Plaintiffs). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 1/11/2021. (sj)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE. Document filed by Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,..(Kernan, James)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kernan, James)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 034480/2013. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23292906).Document filed by Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Kernan, James) Modified on 1/4/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broad Coverage Service, Inc. et al v. Oriska Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Caring Companion Services, Inc., Caring Professionals, Comfort Loving, Diamond Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC, Eastchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Donna Hodge, Annette Hall, Karen Grant Williams Alexi Arias as the Class Representatives of a Class of E ployees of Employer Defendants as the Interests of the Class may appear,
Represented By: James Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brookhaven Rehabilitation & Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Allstate ASO Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BAYPARK CENTER NURSING AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ORISKA INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Golden Gate Rehabilitation & Health Care Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Nassau Extended Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sentosa Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: West Lawrence Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Parkview Care and Rehabilitation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SC & BP Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pathways Nursing & Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: New Surfside Nursing Home, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Woodmere Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alexi Arias
Represented By: James Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Karen Grant Williams
Represented By: James Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brookside Multicare Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: White Plains Center for Nursing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Annette Hall
Represented By: James Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Edison Home Health Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Caring Professionals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rosewood Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Park Avenue Extended Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Donna Hodge
Represented By: James Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Living Waters Home Care Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HCS Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sunharbor Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Nathan Miller a/k/a NMC Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Little Neck Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Harry's Nurses Registry, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Harbour Health MulticareCenter a/k/a Receiver Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Townhouse Center for Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Comfort Loving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Palffy Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Laconia Nursing Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Spring Creek Rehabilitation & Nursing Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Throgs Neck Extended Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Hamptons Center for Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Garden Care Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mrs. Mary's Place HCS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pharney Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bay Park Center Nursing & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: New Carlton Rehab & Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Preferred Home Care of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Caring Companion Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Grace Plaza Nursing and Rehabilitation a/k/a Pinegrove Manor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Norwich Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Diamond Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYNAMIC CLAIM SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROAD COVERAGE SERVICE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Claim Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Walter Freudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broad Coverage Service, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Walter Freudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: RASHBI MANAGEMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rashbi Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriska Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?