Kinlaw v. City of Mount Vernon et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Kinlaw
Defendant: City of Mount Vernon, Nicholas Detective Smith, John Does#1-8 and Detective Nicholas Smith
Case Number: 7:2021cv00730
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raysor, Lauren)
February 1, 2021 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN 1983 PLAN: Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's 1983 Plan. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation, to review the 1983 Plan for White Plains, effective October 3, 2016, for important information..(rpr)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Mount Vernon, John Does#1-8, Nicholas Smith..(jgo)
January 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 28, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lauren Patricia Raysor to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raysor, Lauren) Modified on 1/28/2021 (jgo).
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of Mount Vernon, Detective Nicholas Smith, John Does#1-8, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Kinlaw..(Raysor, Lauren)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Mount Vernon, Nicholas Detective Smith, John Does#1-8. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23704394)Document filed by Stephen Kinlaw..(Raysor, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinlaw v. City of Mount Vernon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mount Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Detective Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does#1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Nicholas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kinlaw
Represented By: Lauren Patricia Raysor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?