Rose v. Willowby et al
Plaintiff: Rose Karlene and Karlene Rose
Defendant: Willowby Robert, Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC and Robert Willowby
Case Number: 7:2021cv00769
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service was accepted by Paul Hopeck. Document filed by Karlene Rose..(Kurtz, Orin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Robert Willowby served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Karlene Rose..(Kurtz, Orin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC..(dnh)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Willowby..(dnh)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Karlene Rose..(Kurtz, Orin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Willowby, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Karlene Rose..(Kurtz, Orin)
February 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Orin Robert Kurtz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Orin Robert Kurtz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
January 30, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC, Willowby Robert. Document filed by Rose Karlene..(Kurtz, Orin)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Orin Robert Kurtz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the incorrect case number is on the PDF; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/3/2021. (jgo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kurtz, Orin)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rose Karlene..(Kurtz, Orin) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jgo).
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Willowby, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rose Karlene..(Kurtz, Orin) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jgo).
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23725441)Document filed by Rose Karlene..(Kurtz, Orin) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Willowby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Karlene
Represented By: Orin Robert Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlene Rose
Represented By: Orin Robert Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willowby Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carib Fish Market & Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Willowby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?