Trustees of The National Retirement Fund, v. Pat & Rose Dress, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Pat & Rose Dress, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv01168
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1381
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Pat & Rose Dress, Inc. served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent, in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,..(Sapp, David)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ALICO Services Corp., a holding company system for Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,. Document filed by Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,..(Sapp, David)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Oh on behalf of Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,..(Oh, Jennifer)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pat & Rose Dress, Inc...(dnh)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pat & Rose Dress, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,..(Sapp, David)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David C. Sapp, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pat & Rose Dress, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,..(Sapp, David) Modified on 2/10/2021 (dnh).
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sapp, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Pat & Rose Dress, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23877567)Document filed by Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Sapp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of The National Retirement Fund, v. Pat & Rose Dress, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat & Rose Dress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of The National Retirement Fund,
Represented By: David C. Sapp, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?