McFall v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Kathleen McFall
Defendant: Al Stewart
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Department of Labor
Case Number: 7:2021cv02109
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: By 5/27/2021, counsel shall complete and file on the ECF docket their proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (elk)
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR A TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 6/2/21 at 9:30a.m. All counsel and/or parties shall use the following information to appear at the conference by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662 Access Code: 1703567. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
April 28, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #6 Complaint. Document filed by Al Stewart..(Cowart, Brandon)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Al Stewart served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Derrick Mayers. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Al Stewart served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service was accepted by Timothy Deane. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Al Stewart..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Al Stewart..(dnh)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Conor Daniel Ahern to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/17/2021 (jgo).
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/17/2021 (jgo).
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Al Stewart..(dnh)
March 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Conor Daniel Ahern to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; summonses may only be issued to parties of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Conor Daniel Ahern. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Al Stewart. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Audrey Strauss, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/16/2021 (dnh).
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/16/2021 (dnh).
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Al Stewart. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ahern, Conor)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Conor Daniel Ahern to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons are only issued to active parties to the case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Conor Daniel Ahern to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Al Stewart must be added to docket. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Conor Daniel Ahern. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); Dollar Demand $1,825,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 3 (Federal Question); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Conor Daniel Ahern. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Department of Labor. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
March 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 12, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Al Stewart added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Al Stewart. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Ahern, Conor)
March 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Audrey Strauss, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sj).
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Al Stewart, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sj).
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sj).
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Department of Labor. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24239305)Document filed by Kathleen McFall..(Ahern, Conor) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFall v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McFall
Represented By: Conor Daniel Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Stewart
Represented By: Conor Daniel Ahern
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?