Roman v. City of Mount Vernon et al
Plaintiff: Israel Roman
Defendant: City of Mount Vernon, Police Commissioner Glenn Scott, P.O. Saied Karoo, P.O. Tariq K. Hylton, P.O. John Lloyd, Sgt. Janie McKennie, Lt. Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, P.O. John Cerqua, Det. Anthony Burnett, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers, Det. John Mitchell and Police Commissioner Shawn Harris
Case Number: 7:2021cv02214
Filed: March 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. City of Mount Vernon waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Janie McKennie waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shawn Harris waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Glenn Scott waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Tariq K. Hylton waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Saied Karoo waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John Lloyd waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John Cerqua waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nicholas Mastrogiorgio waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John Mitchell waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Anthony Burnett waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Joseph Bushnell on behalf of Anthony Burnett, John Cerqua, City of Mount Vernon, Shawn Harris, Tariq K. Hylton, Saied Karoo, John Lloyd, Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, Janie McKennie, John Mitchell, Glenn Scott..(Bushnell, Steven)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Kelly Schieffer on behalf of Anthony Burnett, John Cerqua, City of Mount Vernon, Shawn Harris, Tariq K. Hylton, Saied Karoo, John Lloyd, Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, Janie McKennie, John Mitchell, Glenn Scott..(Schieffer, Matthew)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. DiFiore on behalf of Anthony Burnett, John Cerqua, City of Mount Vernon, Shawn Harris, Tariq K. Hylton, Saied Karoo, John Lloyd, Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, Janie McKennie, John Mitchell, Glenn Scott..(DiFiore, Anthony)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Quinn on behalf of Anthony Burnett, John Cerqua, City of Mount Vernon, Shawn Harris, Tariq K. Hylton, Saied Karoo, John Lloyd, Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, Janie McKennie, John Mitchell, Glenn Scott..(Quinn, Andrew)
March 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karen Anne Newirth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The City of Mount Vernon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN 1983 PLAN: Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's 1983 Plan. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation, to review the 1983 Plan for White Plains, effective October 3, 2016, for important information.(rpr)
March 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Newirth, Karen)
March 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Burnett, John Cerqua, Shawn Harris, Tariq K. Hylton, Saied Karoo, John Lloyd, Nicholas Mastrogiorgio, Janie McKennie, John Mitchell, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24247756)Document filed by Israel Roman..(Newirth, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. City of Mount Vernon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mount Vernon
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Glenn Scott
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Saied Karoo
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Tariq K. Hylton
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. John Lloyd
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Janie McKennie
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nicholas Mastrogiorgio
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. John Cerqua
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Anthony Burnett
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. John Mitchell
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Shawn Harris
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Roman
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?