Song v. Turtil
Plaintiff: Jeehyung Thomas Song
Defendant: Lawrence C. Turtil
Case Number: 7:2021cv02269
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lawrence C. Turtil, served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Lawrence C. Turtil. Document filed by Jeehyung Thomas Song. (sc)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jeehyung Thomas Song, at 27 W Clinton Ave., Apt. 3N, Tenafly, NJ 07670, on 3/26/2021 Re: #3 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 1 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (sha)
March 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence C. Turtil. (sha)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Defendant Lawrence C. Turtil. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 1, at 8-9.) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/25/2021) (mml) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
March 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
March 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
March 23, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 03/23/2021, Receipt Number 465401276261. (jgl)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence C. Turtil. Document filed by Jeehyung Thomas Song..(rdz)
March 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Song v. Turtil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C. Turtil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeehyung Thomas Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?