Barkai v. Nuendorf et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Dan Barkai
Defendant: Ms. Donnegan, Captain Jeff Wannamaker, John Doe, Chief of Police Ray McCallugh, Detective Robert Nuendorf, Officer Anthony Culianos, Lt. Cummings, Dispatcher Monihan and G. Hoehmann
Case Number: 7:2021cv04060
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. G. Hoehmann, served on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Service was made by Mail, signed and returned by Leslie Kahn, Town Attorney. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sc)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Anthony Culianos, served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sc)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Cummings, served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sc)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Jeff Wannamaker, served on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sc)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Ariel Dan Barkai 214 Hiltop Lane Upper Nyack, NY 10960, at, on 5/19/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Culianos, Cummings, G. Hoehmann, Ray McCallugh, Robert Nuendorf, Jeff Wannamaker. (aan)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 5/19/2021 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Anthony Culianos, Cummings, G. Hoehmann, Ray McCallugh, Robert Nuendorf, Jeff Wannamaker. (aan)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 4.) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issues summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Robert Nuendorf, Anthony Culianos, Officer Donnegan, Dispatcher Monihan, Glenn Cummings, Ray McCallugh, Jeff Wannamaker, and George Hoehmann, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service on these Defendants. The Court declines at this time to issue a Valentin order as to the John Doe employees of the Rockland County District Attorneys Office but will revisit the matter at a later date, if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/18/21) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/12/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Ariel Dan Barkai consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthony Culianos, Cummings, John Doe, Donnegan, G. Hoehmann, Ray McCallugh, Monihan, Robert Nuendorf, Jeff Wannamaker. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ariel Dan Barkai. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkai v. Nuendorf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Donnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jeff Wannamaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Ray McCallugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Robert Nuendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anthony Culianos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispatcher Monihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hoehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Dan Barkai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?