Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Schoology, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Counter Claimant: SCHOOLOGY, INC.
Case Number: 7:2021cv04250
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC and Defendant Schoology, Inc., by their respective undersigned counsel, hereby STIPULATE and AGREE as follows: 1. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this Action are dismissed with prejudice and all claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to the matters dismissed hereby; This Stipulation and Order shall finally resolve the Action between the parties. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 14).. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Schoology, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 7/13/2021 (km).
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jay Johnson to RE-FILE Document #17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. (km)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Excylyn J. Hardin-Smith dated 6/4/2021. The Court reviewed Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), (ECF No. 11, dated June 4, 2021), and Plaintiff's opposition (ECF No. 13, dated June 7, 2021). Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is denied and the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file its proposed motion with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's moving papers shall be served (not filed) on or before July 8, 2021; Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on or before August 9, 2021; Defendant's reply papers shall be served on or before August 24, 2021. All motion documents shall be filed on the reply date, August 24, 2021. The parties shall send two physical courtesy copies to Chambers via mail and one electronic courtesy copy to Chambers via email as the documents are served. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/8/2021) (va)
June 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24641482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/24/2021. Responses due by 8/24/2021. Replies due by 8/24/2021. (va)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24641482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Schoology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(McNabnay, Neil)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jay Johnson dated June 7, 2021 re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Excylyn J. Hardin-Smith dated 6/4/2021. . Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Document filed by Schoology, Inc...(Hardin-Smith, Excylyn)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Excylyn J. Hardin-Smith dated 6/4/2021. Document filed by Schoology, Inc...(Hardin-Smith, Excylyn)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PowerSchool Group LLC for Schoology, Inc.. Document filed by Schoology, Inc...(Hardin-Smith, Excylyn)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Excylyn Janaize Hardin-Smith on behalf of Schoology, Inc...(Hardin-Smith, Excylyn)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Schoology, Inc. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. Service was accepted by Robin Huttbanks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Schoology, Inc.. (sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Schoology, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
May 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schoology, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCHOOLOGY, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24528988)Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Schoology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SCHOOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Excylyn Janaize Hardin-Smith
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?