Johnson v. EnSite USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson, Durell Dantin, James Tettenhorst, Mark Hackett and Michael Bartlett
Defendant: EnSite USA, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv04437
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Michael Bartlett..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mark Hackett..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by James Tettenhorst..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Durell Dantin..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph A. Fitapelli on behalf of Richard Johnson..(Fitapelli, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. EnSite USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Document filed by Richard Johnson..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against EnSite USA, Inc..Document filed by Richard Johnson. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Mazzaferro, Frank)
May 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frank Joseph Mazzaferro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard Johnson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mazzaferro, Frank)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EnSite USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24551247)Document filed by Richard Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent).(Mazzaferro, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. EnSite USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durell Dantin
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tettenhorst
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hackett
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bartlett
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnSite USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?