Blessington v. Merritt et al
Plaintiff: Jill Blessington
Defendant: Frank E Merritt and Kara Lynn Merritt
Case Number: 7:2021cv04703
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Judith C McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter has been referred to the undersigned for all purposes in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Accordingly, the Court will hold an Initial Conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on August 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. ( As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference by telephone set for 8/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/26/2021) (vfr)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADJOURNING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of this case having been reassigned to the Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on July 22, 2021 the Initial Case Management Conference Previously scheduled for August 11, 2021 before Judge Katharine H. Parker is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/23/2021) (vfr)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/11/2021 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/22/2021) (vfr)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
July 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so redesignated. (laq)
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jill Blessington, Frank E Merritt, Kara Lynn Merritt. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/21/2021).(va)
July 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/21/2021. (ajs)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kara Lynn Merritt served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service was accepted by Frank Merritt. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Frank E Merritt served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Service was accepted by Frank Merritt. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jason R. Ohliger, Esq. dated 07/19/2021 re: joint letter. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Seal. Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to strike the filing at docket 11. Separately, while the Court has now received the parties' proposed Case Management Plan, the parties have not yet filed the letter required by the Order scheduling the Initial pretrial conference in this case, which was due yesterday. See Dkt. 9. They are directed to do so forthwith, and no later than 12:00 p.m. on Monday, July 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/16/2021) (va)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jason R. Ohliger, Esq. dated 07/16/2021. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order on Motion to Seal. (va) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 7/16/2021 (va).
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Merritts on June 25, 2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for July 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. Initial Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/25/2021) (kv)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Frank E Merritt, Kara Lynn Merritt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Schmidt, Frederick)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr on behalf of Frank E Merritt, Kara Lynn Merritt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Schmidt, Frederick)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kara Lynn Merritt..(sj)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frank E Merritt..(sj)
May 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason Robert Ohliger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Dutchess. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
May 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ohliger, Jason)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kara Lynn Merritt, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frank E. Merritt, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank E Merritt, Kara Lynn Merritt. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24590423)Document filed by Jill Blessington..(Ohliger, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blessington v. Merritt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank E Merritt
Represented By: Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Lynn Merritt
Represented By: Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Blessington
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?