United States of America v. Glaister
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John K. Glaister
Case Number: 7:2021cv04773
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Telephone conference held on 07/13/2021. Telephone conference scheduled for 08/18/2021 at 10:00am. (HSF)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John K. Glaister waiver sent on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Doud, Rachael)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting (26) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 7:20-cv-03581-NSR-PED Separate CMO to issue. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-03581-NSR-PED, 7:20-cv-03583-NSR-PED, 7:21-cv-04773-NSR (Davison, Paul)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a) granting (24) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases 7:20-cv-3581 (as Lead Case) with 7:20-cv-3583,7:21-cv-4773 in case 7:20-cv-03581-NSR-PED. the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a): a.United States v. Sarah E. Glaister, 20 Civ. 3581 (NSR) (PED), filed May 7, 2020 b.United States v. John K. Glaister, 20 Civ. 3583 (NSR) (PED), filed May 7, 2020 c.United States v. John K. Glaister, 21 Civ. 4773, filed May 27, 2021 2. All papers filed in connection with the consolidated actions will be maintained under the docket of the lead case, 20 Civ. 3581 (NSR) (PED). 3. All papers filed in the consolidated actions shall bear the consolidated caption set forth above. 4. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate 21 Civ. 4773 under the docket of the lead case, 20 Civ. 3581 (NSR) (PED). 5. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to terminate the motions at ECF No. 6 and 24 on 21 Civ. 4773 and 20 Civ. 3581, respectively. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/15/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:20-cv-03581-NSR-PED, , 7:21-cv-04773-NSR (rj) Modified on 6/15/2021 (rj).
June 15, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 7:20-cv-03581-NSR-PED.. (rj)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
June 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
June 1, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cv-03583-NSR-PED. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21 Civ. 4773 with 20 Civ. 3581 and 20 Civ. 3583 addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Samuel Dolinger and Rachael Doud dated 5/28/2021. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John K. Glaister. (vf)
May 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
May 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 7:20-CV-3583. (vf)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20 Civ. 3583. Document filed by United States of America..(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John K. Glaister, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dolinger, Samuel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John K. Glaister. Document filed by United States of America..(Dolinger, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Glaister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Glaister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?