Hahn v. Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: Mr. Kurt Hahn and Kurt Hahn
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs (Agency) and Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 7:2021cv05484
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Extension so ordered. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 14, 2021. Defendant's counsel is reminded to enter a notice of appearance. SO ORDERED. Department of Veteran Affairs answer due 8/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/30/2021) (mml)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Kurt Hahn..(Davis, Christopher)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Veteran Affairs. (sj)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lewis, Precious)
June 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Precious Lewis on behalf of Kurt Hahn..(Lewis, Precious)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Veteran Affairs, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kurt Hahn..(Lewis, Precious)
June 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Quincy Davis to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Quincy Davis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department of Veteran Affairs (Agency). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
June 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher Quincy Davis to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Courthouse Assignment was not selected; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Christopher) Modified on 6/23/2021 (jgo).
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Quincy Davis on behalf of Kurt Hahn..(Davis, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Quincy Davis on behalf of Kurt Hahn..(Davis, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Department of Veteran Affairs (Agency). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24706469)Document filed by Kurt Hahn..(Davis, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Veteran Affairs, re: Complaint. Document filed by Kurt Hahn..(Davis, Christopher) Modified on 6/23/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs (Agency)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Kurt Hahn
Represented By: Christopher Quincy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Hahn
Represented By: Precious Lewis
Represented By: Christopher Quincy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?