Seekircher v. Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Seekircher
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline, Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A., Sanofi S.A. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 7:2021cv05573
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A...(jgo)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Glaxosmithkline Biologials S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS, S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher..(McCallion, Kenneth)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi S.A.. (sj)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals. (sj)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SANOFI S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher..(McCallion, Kenneth)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICAL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher..(McCallion, Kenneth)
August 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Case form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SANOFI S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher..(McCallion, Kenneth) Modified on 8/2/2021 (vf).
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICAL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher..(McCallion, Kenneth) Modified on 8/2/2021 (vf).
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately or one summons request may be filed with a rider/addendum attached; party name on the 'as to' docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glaxosmithkline, Sanofi, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Seekircher. (Attachments: #1 Summons Boehringer, #2 Summons Sanofil).(McCallion, Kenneth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (jgo).
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCallion, Kenneth)
June 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code M 94 Other; Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 367 (Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharma. Personal Injury Product Liability); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country). (vf)
June 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline, Sanofi US Services Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
June 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Foard McCallion to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Civil Cover Sheet not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCallion, Kenneth) Modified on 6/28/2021 (vf).
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Glaxosmithkline Biologials S.A. , Sanofi S.A. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24721816)Document filed by Steven Seekircher.(McCallion, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seekircher v. Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Seekircher
Represented By: Kenneth Foard McCallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?