Stein v. Town Of Greenburgh et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Stein
Defendant: Police Officer Brian Doherty, Patrol Captain Frank Farina, Lieutenant Kobie Powell, Sergeant Alex Rodriguez, Police Officer Frank Kozakiewicz, Sergeant Michael Cookingham, Town Of Greenburgh, Police Officer John Pilla, Lieutenant Brian Matthews, Police Officer Dyana Albano, Lieutenant Robert J Gramaglia, Interim Chief of Pol Brian Ryan, Police Officer Jeff Cerone, Sergeant Patrick T. Grady, Chief of Police Chris McNerney, Sergeant Eric Vlasaty, Interim Chief Brian Ryan, Sergeant Dennis Basulto, Lieutenant Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto, Chris Mcnerney, Robert J Gramaglia, Kobie Powell, Brian Matthews, Frank Farina, Eric Vlasaty, Patrick T Grady, Michael Cookingham, Alex Rodriguez, Jeff Cerone, John Pilla, Brian Doherty, Dyana Albano and Frank Kozakiewicz
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Sgt. & Lt. Dennis Basulto
Case Number: 7:2021cv05673
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 9/27/2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/19/2021) (tg)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Move or Answer the Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Thomas J. Marcoline dated August 18, 2021. Document filed by Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Marcoline on behalf of Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Marcoline on behalf of Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021.SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021., #3 Complaint. Application granted. The time for defendants listed herein to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint is extended to 9/27/2021. Dyana Albano answer due 9/27/2021; Dyana Albano answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ) answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto (Individually ) answer due 9/27/2021; Jeff Cerone answer due 9/27/2021; Jeff Cerone answer due 9/27/2021; Michael Cookingham answer due 9/27/2021; Michael Cookingham answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Doherty answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Doherty answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Farina answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Farina answer due 9/27/2021; Patrick T. Grady answer due 9/27/2021; Patrick T Grady answer due 9/27/2021; Robert J Gramaglia answer due 9/27/2021; Robert J Gramaglia answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Kozakiewicz answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Kozakiewicz answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Matthews answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Matthews answer due 9/27/2021; Chris McNerney answer due 9/27/2021; Chris Mcnerney answer due 9/27/2021; John Pilla answer due 9/27/2021; John Pilla answer due 9/27/2021; Kobie Powell answer due 9/27/2021; Kobie Powell answer due 9/27/2021; Alex Rodriguez answer due 9/27/2021; Alex Rodriguez answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Ryan answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Ryan answer due 9/27/2021; Town Of Greenburgh answer due 9/27/2021; Eric Vlasaty answer due 9/27/2021; Eric Vlasaty answer due 9/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/17/2021) (ate)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021., SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021. Document filed by Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, John Pilla, John Pilla, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Piscionere, Anthony)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony George Piscionere on behalf of Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, John Pilla, John Pilla, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Piscionere, Anthony)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Timothy W. Lewis dated July 21, 2021., #3 Complaint. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 8/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/21/2021) (rro)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Timothy W. Lewis dated July 21, 2021. Document filed by Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, John Pilla, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Lewis, Timothy)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy W. Lewis on behalf of Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, John Pilla, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Lewis, Timothy)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from David R. Fried dated July 8, 2021., #3 Complaint,. Application granted in part. The time for defendant the Town of Greenburgh to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 8/30/2021. To the extent any other defendant seeks the Court's consideration of a request to extend the time to respond to the Complaint, counsel must first enter an appearance pursuant to the Court's Individual Practices Rule 1(E) prior to filing their request.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/9/2021) (nb)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Town Of Greenburgh answer due 8/30/2021. (nb)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from David R. Fried dated July 8, 2021. Document filed by Town Of Greenburgh..(Fried, David)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Robert J. Gramaglia on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Patrick T. Grady on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Michael Cookingham on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Kobie Powell on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on John Pilla on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Jeff Cerone on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Frank Kozakiewicz on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Frank Farina on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Eric Vlasaty on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Dyana Albano on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Dennis Basulto on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Chris McNerney on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Brian Ryan on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Brian Matthews on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Brian Doherty on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Alex Rodriguez on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on Town of Greenburgh on 7/2/2021. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, John Pilla, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(gp)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Greenburgh, Interim Chief Brian Ryan, Chief of Police Chris McNerney, Lieutenant Robert J Gramaglia, Lieutenant Kobie Powell, Lieutenant Brian Matthews, Patrol Captain Frank Farina, Police Officer Brian Doherty, Police Officer Dyana Albano, Sergeant Dennis Basulto, Sergeant Eric Vlasaty, Sergeant Patrick T. Grady, Sergeant Michael Cookingham, Sergeant Alex Rodriguez, Police Officer Jeff Cerone, Police Officer John Pilla, Police Officer Frank Kozakiewicz, Lieutenant Dennis Basulto, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cossu, Denise)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty. Document filed by Kristin Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Letter, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter).(Cossu, Denise) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/1/2021) (gp).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Denise M. Cossu to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Denise M. Cossu re: Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Brian Ryan, Chris McNerney, Robert J. Gramaglia, Kobie Powell, Brian Matthews, Frank Farina, Dennis Basulto, Eric Vlasaty, Patrict T. Grady, Michael Cookingham, Alex Rodriguez, Jeff Cerone, John Pilla, Brian Doherty, Dyana Albano and Frank Kozakiewicz each in their individual capacity, and add party Dennis Basulto in his official capacity as Lieutenant. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Denise M. Cossu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:2000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Brian Ryan, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto, Chris Mcnerney, Robert J Gramaglia, Kobie Powell, Brian Matthews, Frank Farina, Eric Vlasaty, Patrick T Grady, Michael Cookingham, Alex Rodriguez, Jeff Cerone, John Pilla, Brian Doherty, Dyana Albano, Frank Kozakiewicz added. Party added pursuant to #3 Complaint,.Document filed by Kristin Stein. Related document: #3 Complaint,..(Cossu, Denise)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cossu, Denise) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jgo).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24739407)Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jgo).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kristin Stein added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Kristin Stein. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Cossu, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Town Of Greenburgh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Brian Doherty
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrol Captain Frank Farina
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Kobie Powell
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Alex Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Frank Kozakiewicz
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Michael Cookingham
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Of Greenburgh
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: David Ross Fried
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Pilla
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Brian Matthews
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Dyana Albano
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Robert J Gramaglia
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interim Chief of Pol Brian Ryan
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jeff Cerone
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Patrick T. Grady
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Chris McNerney
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Eric Vlasaty
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interim Chief Brian Ryan
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dennis Basulto
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Dennis Basulto
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Basulto
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Mcnerney
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Gramaglia
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobie Powell
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Matthews
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Farina
Represented By: Thomas J. Marcoline
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Vlasaty
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick T Grady
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cookingham
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cerone
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pilla
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Doherty
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyana Albano
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kozakiewicz
Represented By: Anthony George Piscionere
Represented By: Timothy W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Sgt. & Lt. Dennis Basulto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Stein
Represented By: Denise M. Cossu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?