Hurm v. Gruma Corporation et al.
Plaintiff: Gerald Hurm
Defendant: Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products and Gruma Corporation doing business as Mission Foods
Case Number: 7:2021cv05689
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A (ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties, for the convenience of the parties, that all matters related to the parties' claims and defenses in the instant action shall be arbitrated by the parties in New York under New York law pursuant to voluntary agreement between the parties to arbitrate, under the Comprehensive Arbitration Rules & Procedures of JAMS, with all arbitrator fees of a single arbitrator to be paid solely by the defendant herein. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that, as a result of the foregoing stipulation and agreement, the instant action is hereby dismissed without prejudice by Plaintiff under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by virtue of this stipulation being signed by all parties that have appeared in this civil action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/12/2021) (ama)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Gruma Corporation and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Gerald Hurm. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Smith, Sam)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Sam Smith, Esq. dated 8/12/2021 re: Arbitration. Document filed by Gerald Hurm..(Smith, Sam)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/12/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (mjl)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Richard J. Reibstein dated August 4, 2021. Document filed by Gruma Corporation..(Reibstein, Richard)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: By 8/5/2021, defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (mjl)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Richard J. Reibstein dated July 6, 2021. Document filed by Gruma Corporation..(Reibstein, Richard)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sam Brooks Smith on behalf of Gerald Hurm..(Smith, Sam)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randy J. Perlmutter on behalf of Gerald Hurm..(Perlmutter, Randy)
July 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 6, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:21-cv-05206-VB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard Jay Reibstein re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Jay Reibstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
July 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Jay Reibstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
July 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 1, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly related to 21cv5206. (pc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:21-cv-5206. Document filed by Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products..(Reibstein, Richard)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reibstein, Richard)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Gruma S.A.B. de C.V. for Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products. Document filed by Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products..(Reibstein, Richard)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 033234-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24741067).Document filed by Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings).(Reibstein, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurm v. Gruma Corporation et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruma Corporation d/b/a Mission Foods and Guerrero Mexican Food Products
Represented By: Richard Jay Reibstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruma Corporation doing business as Mission Foods
Represented By: Richard Jay Reibstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hurm
Represented By: Randy J. Perlmutter
Represented By: Sam Brooks Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?