JNP Ventures, LLC d/b/a Scarsdale Supplements v. Carbon Beauty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JNP Ventures, LLC doing business as Scarsdale Supplements
Defendant: Carbon Beauty, LLC and Daniel Sudman
Case Number: 7:2021cv06136
Filed: July 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 12/24/2021. Fact Discovery due by 2/10/2022. Expert Discovery due by 2/24/2022. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/9/2021) (mml)
September 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 9/9/2021. Plaintiff's counsel(s) Carl Finger, Esq. and David Dahan, Esq. appear telephonically. General Counsel to Plaintiff Scott Ratchick, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel(s) Henry Cittone, Esq. and Antoaneta Tarpanova, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Andrew Kirschenbaum appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules the next status conference for March 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by February 17, 2022; opposition due February 24, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel(s) are directed by the Court to file Notice(s) of Appearance. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb) (wc)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova on behalf of Carbon Beauty, LLC, Daniel Sudman..(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF TIME OF CONFERENCE: The Initial Conference previously scheduled before this Court for September 9, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. will be held at 3:30 p.m. (same date) via telephone. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on July 29, 2021, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. (as further set forth herein). Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel..(kv)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Carbon Beauty, LLC, Daniel Sudman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Cittone, Henry)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on September 9, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. (via telephone). Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carbon Beauty, LLC..(Cittone, Henry)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Carbon Beauty, LLC, Daniel Sudman..(Cittone, Henry)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(vf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Cittone, Henry)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 57678/2021..Document filed by Daniel Sudman, Carbon Beauty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint from State Court).(Cittone, Henry)
July 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Henry Joseph Cittone to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Henry Joseph Cittone to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the State Court Removal Index number on pleading does not correspond with the Removal Index number entered in ECF docket entry. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/26/2021. (vf)
July 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cittone, Henry)
July 17, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING- NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 57678/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24807747).Document filed by Daniel Sudman, Carbon Beauty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons+Complaint).(Cittone, Henry) Modified on 7/19/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JNP Ventures, LLC d/b/a Scarsdale Supplements v. Carbon Beauty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JNP Ventures, LLC doing business as Scarsdale Supplements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Beauty, LLC
Represented By: Henry Joseph Cittone
Represented By: Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sudman
Represented By: Henry Joseph Cittone
Represented By: Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?