Cruz v. Sullivan County Government Center et al
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz
Defendant: Sullivan County Government Center, Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Susan Southerton, Sullivan County Adult Care Center doing business as The Care Center at Sunset Lake and JOHN DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious)
Case Number: 7:2021cv06410
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO-ORDERED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time of the defendants, SULLIVAN COUNTY GOVERNMENT CENTER and SULLIVAN COUNTY ADULT CARE CENTER d/b/a THE CARE CENTER AT SUNSET LAKE, to Answer or move with respect to the Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to and including September 28, 2021. Defendant is reminded that he is to file a pre-motion conference letter conforming to this Court's local rules to the extent he is responding to the Complaint through motion practice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion at ECF No. 11. Sullivan County Adult Care Center answer due 9/28/2021; Sullivan County Government Center answer due 9/28/2021., Motions terminated: #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Michael Davidoff, Esq. dated September 10, 2021. filed by Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/21/2021) (tg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Susan Southerton served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. Service was accepted by Susan Southerton. Document filed by Maria Cruz..(Anderson, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center..(Davidoff, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Michael Davidoff, Esq. dated September 10, 2021 re: Withdrawing request in letter-motion Dkt. 11. Document filed by Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center..(Davidoff, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Michael Davidoff, Esq. dated September 10, 2021. Document filed by Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center. (Attachments: #1 Email exchange).(Davidoff, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time of the defendants, SULLIVAN COUNTY GOVERNMENT CENTER and SULLIVAN COUNTY ADULT CARE CENTER d/b/a THE CARE CENTER AT SUNSET LAKE, to answer or move with respect to the Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to and including September 14, 2021.Sullivan County Adult Care Center answer due 9/14/2021; Sullivan County Government Center answer due 9/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/27/2021) (tg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center..(Davidoff, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Davidoff on behalf of Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center..(Davidoff, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sullivan County Adult Care Center served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Ellen Osterholt. Document filed by Maria Cruz..(Anderson, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sullivan County Government Center served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grande. Document filed by Maria Cruz..(Anderson, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anderson, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Southerton, Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center..(jgo)
July 29, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Susan Southerton, Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center, JOHN DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious) added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Maria Cruz. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Anderson, Michael)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Christopher Anderson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Christopher Anderson re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party John Does 1-10. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Christopher Anderson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451; Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000; the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Christopher Anderson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sullivan County Adult Care Center. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anderson, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2021 (jgo).
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Southerton, Sullivan County Government Center, Sullivan County Adult Care Center, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Cruz..(Anderson, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Southerton, Sullivan County Adult Care Center, Sullivan County Government Center. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24851284)Document filed by Maria Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination (Form 5), #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue).(Anderson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Sullivan County Government Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz
Represented By: Michael Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan County Government Center
Represented By: Michael Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan County Adult Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Southerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan County Adult Care Center doing business as The Care Center at Sunset Lake
Represented By: Michael Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?