Quinones v. Jackett
Plaintiff: Manuel Otazu Quinones
Defendant: Marc P. Jackett
Case Number: 7:2021cv06651
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 3/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Expert Discovery due by 5/2/2021. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 12:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/28/2021) (mml)
September 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 9/28/2021. Plaintiff's counsel Steve Kimmel, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel Jonathan Greisman, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Jennifer Butwin appears telephonically. The Court directs Plaintiff's counsel (Steve Kimmel, Esq.) to file a Notice of Appearance. Case Management Plan filled out and signed by the Court. The Court schedules the next status conference for May 17, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by May 3, 2022; opposition due May 10, 2022. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 12:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on September 28, 2021 at 4:45 p.m. (via telephone). Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on July 29, 2021, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 04:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 04:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
August 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge John P. Cronan is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so redesignated. (wb)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/19/2021) (jca)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greisman, Jonathan)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jonathan W Greisman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF001435-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24897785).Document filed by Marc P. Jackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Bill of Particulars, #3 Exhibit Police Report, #4 Exhibit Pleadings).(Greisman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. Jackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Otazu Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc P. Jackett
Represented By: Jonathan W Greisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?