Santiago v. Moreta Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PHILLIPE A. SANTIAGO
Defendant: MORETA Trucking, JUAN JESUS MORENO TAMEZ and Moreta Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv06761
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Phillipe A. Santiago..(Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807401/2021E..Document filed by Juan Jesus Moreno Tamez, Moreta Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Answer, #2 Supplement Notice of Removal, #3 Supplement STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1, #4 Supplement Jury Demand).(Sloane, Marc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sloane, Marc)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 10/18/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on January 14, 2021) (vf)
August 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc D. Sloane. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JUAN JESUS MORENO TAMEZ, MORETA Trucking, PHILLIPE A. SANTIAGO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marc D. Sloane. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marc D. Sloane to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):PDF Error, the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct, the PDF Filing Court title reflects another Filing Court; and State Court Documents were not attached.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/17/2021. (vf)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807401/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24919249).Document filed by JUAN JESUS MORENO TAMEZ, MORETA Trucking..(Sloane, Marc) Modified on 8/12/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Moreta Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIPE A. SANTIAGO
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORETA Trucking
Represented By: Marc D. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN JESUS MORENO TAMEZ
Represented By: Marc D. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreta Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Marc D. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?