Medicis v. Ally Bank et al
Plaintiff: David De Medicis
Defendant: Ally Bank and Ally Financial Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv06799
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kevin Slyne on behalf of David De Medicis..(Slyne, Patrick)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ally Financial Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Kathy Hunter- Manager. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER terminating #10 Letter Motion for Conference re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. The Court has reviewed Defendants' letter motion seeking leave to file its proposed motion to dismiss (ECF No. 10) and Plaintiff's response thereto (ECF No. 14). The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement and grants Defendants leave to file the propose motion to dismiss as follows: moving papers shall be served (not filed) on October 25, 2021; opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on November 24, 2021; reply papers shall be served December 9, 2021. All motion papers shall be filed on the reply date, December 9, 2021. The parties shall provide the Court with two hard courtesy copies of all motion papers as they are served. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 10. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/21) (yv)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/9/2021. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (yv)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Melissa R. Emert dated September 22, 2021 re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. . Document filed by David De Medicis..(Emert, Melissa)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa R. Emert on behalf of David De Medicis..(Emert, Melissa)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Walker on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Walker, Richard)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Sparks Bradley on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Sparks Bradley, Rachel)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. Document filed by Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Cucinella, Brooke)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ally Financial Inc. for Ally Bank. Document filed by Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Cucinella, Brooke)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Cucinella, Brooke)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Ally Bank on 8/27/2021. Service was accepted by Steve Lemberg, Authorized Legal Agent. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Shub on behalf of David De Medicis..(Shub, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Steven Graifman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney User not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David De Medicis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ally Bank and Ally Financial Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graifman, Gary)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24926508)Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary) Modified on 8/13/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medicis v. Ally Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David De Medicis
Represented By: Gary Steven Graifman
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Slyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Richard Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella
Represented By: Rachel Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Richard Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?